Epic Tech, LLC v. Pen-Tech Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Epic Tech, LLC
Defendant: Pen-Tech Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02428
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Richard M. Lehrer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9969195). with Brief In Support by Pen-Tech Associates, Inc.. (Bushnell, Vincent) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 28, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #10 Counterclaim by Epic Tech, LLC.(Crosby, L.) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 21, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay with Brief In Support by Pen-Tech Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit IPR Petition, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bushnell, Vincent)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 4/5/2021.), COUNTERCLAIM against Epic Tech, LLC with Jury Demand by Pen-Tech Associates, Inc..(Bushnell, Vincent) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 Clerks Notation re #7 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (lwb)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons by Epic Tech, LLC. (Crosby, L.)
June 17, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Epic Tech, LLC. Pen-Tech Associates, Inc. served on 6/16/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (Crosby, L.)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 6/10/20. (bjh)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED AO 120 . (Crosby, L.)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/20. (eop)
June 9, 2020 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (eop)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Pen-Tech Associates, Inc.. (eop)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Epic Tech, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9772411) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epic Tech, LLC v. Pen-Tech Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pen-Tech Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epic Tech, LLC
Represented By: L. Clint Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?