21st Century Garage LLC v. Spireon, Inc.
Plaintiff: 21st Century Garage LLC
Defendant: Spireon, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02493
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Spireon, Inc. Answer due 9/3/2020. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/3/2020. (dob)
July 31, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by 21st Century Garage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alexander, Cortney)
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by 21st Century Garage LLC. Spireon, Inc. served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020 as found in #9 Affidavit. (dob)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to Spireon, Inc.. (Alexander, Cortney)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/8/2019. (bgt)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/20. (eop)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Spireon, Inc.. (eop)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 21st Century Garage LLC. (eop)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (eop)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by 21st Century Garage LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9791712) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -US Patent No. 6,240,365, #2 Exhibit -B -US Patent No. 6,584,403, #3 Exhibit -C -Spireon Submissions to USPTO, #4 Exhibit -D -Claim Chart for '365 Patent, #5 Exhibit -E -Claim Chart for '365 Patent, #6 Exhibit -F -Claim Chart for '403 Patent, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 21st Century Garage LLC v. Spireon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spireon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 21st Century Garage LLC
Represented By: Cortney Scott Alexander
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?