Driver v. Drakes et al
Plaintiff: William Driver
Defendant: AGCS Marine Insurance Company, The Guarantee Company of North America USA, DeMarcus Drakes, C.R. England, Inc. and John Does 1-3
Case Number: 1:2020cv02769
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service of Discovery Materials by William Driver.(Sawyer, Norman)
August 26, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service of Discovery Materials by William Driver.(Sawyer, Norman)
August 18, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by DeMarcus Drakes.(Bennett, Quinn) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting the #13 Consent Motion to Dismiss defendants AGCS Marine Insurance Company and The Guarantee Company of North America USA without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 08/14/20. (aaq)
August 14, 2020 Submission of #13 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Fewer Than All Parties to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (aaq)
August 10, 2020 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by DeMarcus Drakes. DeMarcus Drakes served on 8/10/2020. (Bennett, Quinn)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
July 31, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by AGCS Marine Insurance Company, C.R. England, Inc., The Guarantee Company of North America USA.(Bennett, Quinn) Modified on 7/31/2020 to remove abbreviated text (tmf).
July 30, 2020 Filing 15 Initial Disclosures by William Driver.(Sawyer, Norman)
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 Initial Disclosures by AGCS Marine Insurance Company, C.R. England, Inc., The Guarantee Company of North America USA.(Bennett, Quinn)
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Fewer Than All Parties by C.R. England, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, Quinn)
July 24, 2020 Filing 12 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): August 10, 2020 through and including September 1, 2020, October 19, 2020 through and including October 26, 2020, by Michael David Hostetter. (Hostetter, Michael)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #10 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Upon review of the information contained in the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan form completed and filed by the parties, the Court orders that the time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court, except as herein modified: The parties shall have six months for discovery. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/20/2020. (tmf)
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by William Driver. (Sawyer, Norman)
July 14, 2020 Clerks Notation re #7 and #9 Certificate of Interested Persons read and approved by LMM. (rlb)
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons by William Driver. (Sawyer, Norman)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by AGCS Marine Insurance Company, C.R. England, Inc., The Guarantee Company of North America USA identifying Corporate Parent Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Comapny, Corporate Parent Intact Financial Corporation for The Guarantee Company of North America USA. (Bennett, Quinn)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/2/2020. (tmf)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/1/20. (eop)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by C.R. England, Inc., AGCS Marine Insurance Company and The Guarantee Company of North America USA. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number CGANDC-9853699) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Exhibit -D, #5 Exhibit -E, #6 Exhibit -F, #7 Exhibit -G, #8 Exhibit -H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by The Guarantee Company of North America USA. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by AGCS Marine Insurance Company. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 29, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by C.R. England, Inc.. Discovery ends on 11/27/2020. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Driver v. Drakes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGCS Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael David Hostetter
Represented By: Quinn Curtis Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Represented By: Michael David Hostetter
Represented By: Quinn Curtis Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeMarcus Drakes
Represented By: Quinn Curtis Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. England, Inc.
Represented By: Michael David Hostetter
Represented By: Quinn Curtis Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Driver
Represented By: Norman Marshall Sawyer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?