Branum v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: Jason A. Branum
Defendant: Terry Butterfield, Diane Barnett, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Terry M. Williams, Norfolk Southern Corporation and Thomas Bartley, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02801
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:56
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 26 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Terry Butterfield, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Terry M. Williams. (adg)
August 20, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Terry Butterfield, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Terry M. Williams.(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 19, 2020 Filing 24 Return of Service Executed by Jason A. Branum. Terry M. Williams served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (Lampros, Peter)
August 19, 2020 Filing 23 Return of Service Executed by Jason A. Branum. Diane Barnett served on 8/14/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (Lampros, Peter)
August 17, 2020 RETURN of #22 APPLICATION for Admission of John M. Graham Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10025870). to attorney for correction re: Local counsel. (cdg)
August 17, 2020 RETURN of #21 APPLICATION for Admission of Sydney F. Frazier, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10025825). to attorney for correction re: Local counsel. (cdg)
August 13, 2020 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Admission of John M. Graham Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10025870).by Terry Butterfield, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Terry M. Williams. (Carroll, Desharne) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 13, 2020 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Admission of Sydney F. Frazier, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10025825).by Terry Butterfield, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Terry M. Williams. (Carroll, Desharne) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 13, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION Requesting Local Counsel Designation for Pro Hac Vice Admissions of Sydney F. Frazier, Jr. and John M. Graham by Terry Butterfield, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Terry M. Williams. (Carroll, Desharne) Modified on 8/14/2020 to edit event text(bnp).
August 12, 2020 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Persons by Terry Butterfield, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Terry M. Williams. (Carroll, Desharne)
August 12, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Terry Butterfield, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Terry M. Williams. Discovery ends on 1/11/2021.(Carroll, Desharne) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
July 29, 2020 Filing 16 Electronic Summons Issued as to Thomas Bartley, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Summons Bartley)(bnp)
July 28, 2020 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed by Jason A. Branum. Norfolk Southern Corporation served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020. (Lampros, Peter)
July 28, 2020 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by Jason A. Branum. Norfolk Southern Railway Company served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020. (Lampros, Peter)
July 28, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Jason A. Branum (Lampros, Peter)
July 28, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Jason A. Branum (Lampros, Peter)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 7/13/2020. (bnp)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/1/20. (eop)
July 6, 2020 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Thomas Bartley, Jr.. (eop)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Diane Barnett. (eop)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Terry M. Williams. (eop)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Terry M. Williams. (eop)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Terry Butterfield. (eop)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Corporation. (eop)
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (eop)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jason A. Branum. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9870466) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branum v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Butterfield
Represented By: Desharne Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Desharne Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry M. Williams
Represented By: Desharne Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation
Represented By: Desharne Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Bartley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason A. Branum
Represented By: William C. Tucker, Jr.
Represented By: Peter Andrew Lampros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?