Collins Asset Group, LLC v. Diversified Financing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Collins Asset Group, LLC
Defendant: VENETIA LAPPAS, JEANINE GORCHEN-KRASLEY, Bob McCauley, Yu Zhang, CARLISE STARGILL, Donna Peters, JAMES KARG, PIRRO PETI, Karen Warren, OLIVIA SAN MIGUEL, HAROLD LIKEY, BRAD VAN, RANDALL BAHJAT, GREGORY TINDALL, DEBBIE EVANS, Winston Harris, Brian Wilson, JAMES LAPPAS, Jay Sham Gabehart, Lian He, TOM CHRISMAN, IRA Services Trust Company, Dan Nolan, Leonard Kleinpeter, Evans Family Trust, Francis Early, Jeffrey Arnold, LUIS SAN MIGUEL, Diversified Financing, LLC, Jin Li, DAWN VAUGHN, SHERRIE GEORGE, WENDY PYNE, Hongbin Li, Hong Yu, John C Jenkins, Keith Morales, Diane Denton, David Ernest, JUDITH TALLETT, Yanbo Jiang, Marie Johnson, John Does(s), Sharal Herbert, FEI HAVENOR, JACKLINE SLEZAK, TERRI SALTZMAN, Jacqueline Hazey, LORY WILLIAMS, KATHERINE ARNOLD, Stephen Thaxton, John Brady Sessums, Frank Lopinto, David Farwick, ARTHUR MARKS, Traci Cougle, TERRY McKNIGHT, William Fraser, Xio Yun Pan, TRISH LAVECK, Scott Havenor, PEGGY McCAULEY, Yiling Shi, Daniel Hebert, Vantage Retirement Plans, LLC, Sonoqui, LLC, Patricia Thaxton, Gertrude Collins, MITCH McDONALD, Peina Wang, Susan Pollinger, Ferrum II, LLC, Thomas Denton, FRANK SCHENCK, Deldeirdra Webb, Jill Ann Purkey, CATHY KAISER, Kimberly burks, Gerald Holmes, Amy Huang, Scott Farwick, Provident Trust Group, Orvis Tully, JEFF BROWNE, ERNESTO DIGIORDANO, Karen Lawrence, John Ferguson, Jeanine Hilliard Gorechan, MARK POULSEN, BILL ZOELLIN, Blake Wellerman, Firenze Family Trust, Micaela Rogers, John McCormick, JEFF MULLIS, ANG LI, Richard Lester, NEAL COLLINS, Hanh Nguyen, Daniel Nola and David Evans
Case Number: 1:2020cv02818
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Clarence Cooper
Referring Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Dawn Vaughn, Daniel Nola, Dayton P. Haigney, III, Deldeirdra Webb, Gregory P. Cronin, Jill A. Purkey, John W. Shanklin, II, Kimberly Burks, Lavina A. Acaru, Leonard Benowich, Melinda Steuer, Micaela Rogers, Michael A. Starvaggi, Michael J. Slocum, Orvis Tully, Stephen J. Jones, Terri Saltzman, and Winston Harris re #343 Notice (Other). (jpa)
September 3, 2020 Filing 344 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Jason R. Doss replacing attorney Leonard Benowich. (Doss, Jason)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 343 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 1, 2020 Filing 342 NOTICE of Appearance by Melinda Jane Steuer on behalf of GREGORY TINDALL (Steuer, Melinda)
September 1, 2020 Filing 341 NOTICE Of Filing Joint Proposed Schedule for Hearing on Order to Show Cause by KATHERINE ARNOLD, Jeffrey Arnold, JEFF BROWNE, NEAL COLLINS, Gertrude Collins, Scott Farwick, Firenze Family Trust, William Fraser, JEANINE GORCHEN-KRASLEY, Jeanine Hilliard Gorechan, Gerald Holmes, John C Jenkins, JAMES KARG, Karen Lawrence, Richard Lester, PEGGY McCAULEY, Bob McCauley, MITCH McDONALD, PIRRO PETI, Susan Pollinger, LUIS SAN MIGUEL, OLIVIA SAN MIGUEL, FRANK SCHENCK, JACKLINE SLEZAK, JUDITH TALLETT, Patricia Thaxton, Stephen Thaxton re #334 Order (Doss, Jason) Modified on 9/2/2020 to edit text (jpk).
August 31, 2020 Filing 340 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Dayton Peter Haigney III re #300 INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES. Return to Sender. Unable to Forward. (tcc)
August 31, 2020 Filing 339 RESPONSE in Opposition re #319 MOTION to Strike #312 Notice of Filing,, Declaration of Trisha LaVeck In Opposition to Collins Asset Group, LLCs Order to Show Cause filed by KATHERINE ARNOLD, Jeffrey Arnold, JEFF BROWNE, NEAL COLLINS, Gertrude Collins, Scott Farwick, Firenze Family Trust, William Fraser, JEANINE GORCHEN-KRASLEY, Jeanine Hilliard Gorechan, Gerald Holmes, John C Jenkins, JAMES KARG, Karen Lawrence, Richard Lester, PEGGY McCAULEY, Bob McCauley, MITCH McDONALD, PIRRO PETI, Susan Pollinger, FRANK SCHENCK, JACKLINE SLEZAK, JUDITH TALLETT, JUDITH TALLETT, Patricia Thaxton, Stephen Thaxton. (Doss, Jason)
August 28, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of mailing (second) as to Kimberly burks RE: #330 Order. (aaq)
August 27, 2020 Filing 338 Mail sent to Kimberly Burkes, #330 Order, returned not deliverable. Marked: Return for postage. (aaq)
August 27, 2020 Filing 337 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R. Doss on behalf of LUIS SAN MIGUEL, OLIVIA SAN MIGUEL (Doss, Jason)
August 27, 2020 Filing 336 Amended NOTICE of Appearance by John R Richards on behalf of Provident Trust Group (Richards, John) Modified on 8/28/2020 to edit event text (jpk).
August 27, 2020 Filing 335 NOTICE of Appearance by John R Richards on behalf of Diversified Financing, LLC (Richards, John)
August 26, 2020 NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING : Hearing set for 9/23/2020 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1708 before Judge Eleanor L. Ross. Connection Instructions: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1607436987 Meeting ID: 160 743 6987 Passcode: 602019 One tap mobile +16692545252,,1607436987#,,,,,,0#,,602019# US (San Jose) +16468287666,,1607436987#,,,,,,0#,,602019# US (New York) You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (mlb)
August 25, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Dawn Vaughn, Daniel Nola, Dayton P. Haigney, III, Deldeirdra Webb, Donna Peters, Gregory P. Cronin, Jill A. Purkey, John W. Shanklin, II, Kimberly Burks, Leonard Benowich, Micaela Rogers, Michael A. Starvaggi, Michael J. Slocum, Orvis Tully, Stephen J. Jones, Terri Saltzman, and Winston Harris re #334 Order. (jpk)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER: The Court SCHEDULES a hearing to be held via Zoom on the #33 Order to Show Cause for Wednesday, September 23, 2020, at 9:30 A.M. Any pro se Party who wishes to join the hearing should provide an email address to the undersigned's Courtroom Deputy. The Court DIRECTS Counsel to jointly submit, within seven (7) days from the date of entry of this order, a proposed schedule of the hearing setting forth how much time is requested by each Party to argue each issue. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 8/25/2020. (jpk)
August 25, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing (via email) to Attorney Lavinia A. Acaru as to John McCormick regarding Order on Application for Admission PHV. (mlb)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #331 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lavinia Andreea Acaru. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 8/25/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
August 25, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #331 APPLICATION for Admission of Lavinia Andreea Acaru Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Lavinia Andreea Acaru added appearing on behalf of John McCormick (nmb)
August 24, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Dawn Vaughn, Daniel Nola, Dayton P. Haigney, III, Deldeirdra Webb, Donna Peters, Gregory P. Cronin, Jill A. Purkey, John W. Shanklin, II, Kimberly Burks, Lavina A. Acaru, Leonard Benowich, Micaela Rogers, Michael A. Starvaggi, Michael J. Slocum, Orvis Tully, Stephen J. Jones, Terri Saltzman, and Winston Harris re #333 Order. (jpk)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER denying as moot #323 Motion for Extension of Time. Because the Court has adjourned the deadline for all interpleader Defendants named in this case to file an answer or responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Interpleader Complaint until further order of the Court, the undersigned DENIES AS MOOT Interpleader Defendant Donna Peters' #323 motion. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 8/24/2020. (jpk)
August 21, 2020 Submission of #323 MOTION for Extension of Time to answer to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpk)
August 20, 2020 Filing 332 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Atty Dayton Haigney, III re #294 Order. (bjh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 331 APPLICATION for Admission of Lavinia Andreea Acaru Pro Hac Vice. with Brief In Support by John McCormick. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Doss, Jason) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 17, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Dawn Vaughn, Daniel Nola, Dayton P. Haigney, III, Deldeirdra Webb, Donna Peters, Gregory P. Cronin, Jill A. Purkey, John W. Shanklin, II, Kimberly Burks, Lavina A. Acaru, Leonard Benowich, Micaela Rogers, Michael A. Starvaggi, Michael J. Slocum, Orvis Tully, Stephen J. Jones, Terri Saltzman, and Winston Harris re #330 Order. (jpk)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER granting #329 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Strike shall be filed on or before August 31, 2020. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 8/14/2020. (jpk)
August 13, 2020 Filing 329 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response In Opposition to Plaintiff's #319 Motion to Strike #312 Declaration of Trisha LaVeck Filed In Opposition to Plaintiff's Order to Show Cause with Brief In Support by KATHERINE ARNOLD, Jeffrey Arnold, JEFF BROWNE, NEAL COLLINS, Gertrude Collins, Scott Farwick, Firenze Family Trust, William Fraser, JEANINE GORCHEN-KRASLEY, Jeanine Hilliard Gorechan, Gerald Holmes, John C Jenkins, JAMES KARG, Karen Lawrence, Richard Lester, MITCH McDONALD, PIRRO PETI, Susan Pollinger, FRANK SCHENCK, JACKLINE SLEZAK, Patricia Thaxton, Stephen Thaxton, JUDITH TALLETT, PEGGY McCAuley, Bob McCauley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doss, Jason) Modified on 8/14/2020 to add filers (bnp). Modified on 8/17/2020 to edit text (jpk).
August 13, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing (via email) to Attorney John W. Shanklin as to Ferrum II, LLC regarding Order on Application for Admission PHV. (mlb)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #328 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John W. Shanklin, Jr.. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 8/13/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
August 13, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #328 APPLICATION for Admission of John Shanklin Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney John W. Shanklin, II added appearing on behalf of Ferrum II, LLC (nmb)
August 11, 2020 Filing 328 APPLICATION for Admission of John Shanklin Pro Hac Vice.by Ferrum II, LLC. (Bersinger, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 5, 2020 Filing 327 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Donna Peters. Discovery ends on 1/4/2021.(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 5, 2020 RETURN of #320 APPLICATION for Admission of John Shanklin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9980991). to attorney for correction regarding local counsel address. (nmb)
August 4, 2020 Filing 326 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Dayton Peter Haigney III re #299 Order (jpa)
August 4, 2020 Filing 325 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Dayton Peter Haigney III re #301 Notice (Other) (jpa)
August 4, 2020 Filing 324 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Dayton Peter Haigney III re #293 Order of Recusal (jpa)
August 4, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Dawn Vaughn, Daniel Nola, Dayton P. Haigney, III, Deldeirdra Webb, Gregory P. Cronin, Jill A. Purkey, John W. Shanklin, II, Kimberly Burks, Lavina A. Acaru, Leonard Benowich, Melinda Steuer, Micaela Rogers, Michael A. Starvaggi, Michael J. Slocum, Orvis Tully, Stephen J. Jones, Terri Saltzman, and Winston Harris re #321 Notice (Other). (jpk)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 321 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
August 3, 2020 Filing 323 MOTION for Extension of Time to answer by Donna Peters. (jpa)
August 3, 2020 Filing 322 NOTICE Of Filing of Pro Se Appearance by Donna Peters (jpa)
August 3, 2020 Filing 320 APPLICATION for Admission of John Shanklin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9980991).by Ferrum II, LLC. (Bersinger, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing (via email) to Attorneys Melinda J. Steuer and Gregory P. Cronin as to Collins Asset Group, LLC and GREGORY TINDALL regarding Order on Application for Admission PHV. (mlb)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #316 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Melinda Jane Steuer and GRANTING #317 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Gregory P. Cronin. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 8/3/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
August 3, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #317 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory P. Cronin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9968493). Attorney Gregory P. Cronin added appearing on behalf of Collins Asset Group, LLC, Collins Asset Group, LLC, Collins Asset Group, LLC (cdg)
July 31, 2020 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #318 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant Trish Laveck ONLY pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (jpk)
July 30, 2020 Filing 319 MOTION to Strike #312 Notice of Filing,, Declaration of Trisha LaVeck In Opposition to Collins Asset Group, LLCs Order to Show Cause by Collins Asset Group, LLC, Collins Asset Group, LLC, Collins Asset Group, LLC. (Kastorf, Kurt)
July 30, 2020 Filing 318 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Trish Laveck filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC (Kastorf, Kurt)
July 30, 2020 Filing 317 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory P. Cronin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9968493).by Collins Asset Group, LLC. (Kastorf, Kurt) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 29, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #316 APPLICATION for Admission of Melinda Jane Steuer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9956038).. Attorney Melinda Steuer added appearing on behalf of GREGORY TINDALL (nmb)
July 28, 2020 RETURN of #314 APPLICATION for Admission of Lavinia Andreea Acaru Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9945427). to attorney for correction regarding local counsel. (nmb)
July 27, 2020 Filing 316 APPLICATION for Admission of Melinda Jane Steuer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9956038). with Brief In Support by GREGORY TINDALL. (Doss, Jason) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 27, 2020 Filing 315 NOTICE of Appearance by David Austin Bersinger on behalf of Ferrum II, LLC (Bersinger, David)
July 23, 2020 Filing 314 APPLICATION for Admission of Lavinia Andreea Acaru Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9945427).by John McCormick. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing)(Alderman, Samuel) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 21, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Dawn Vaughn, Daniel Nola, Dayton P. Haigney, III, Deldeirdra Webb, Gregory P. Cronin, Jill A. Purkey, John W. Shanklin, II, Kimberly Burks, Lavina A. Acaru, Leonard Benowich, Melinda Steuer, Micaela Rogers, Michael A. Starvaggi, Michael J. Slocum, Orvis Tully, Stephen J. Jones, Terri Saltzman, and Winston Harris re #313 Order. (jpk)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER granting #311 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. This Court adjourns the deadline for all interpleader-defendants named in this case to file an answer or responsive pleading to Plaintiff's amended interpleader complaint until further order of the Court and the answers or other responsive pleadings filed in accordance with this order shall be deemed timely under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 7/20/2020. (jpk)
July 20, 2020 Filing 312 NOTICE Of Filing Declaration of Trisha LaVeck In Opposition to Collins Asset Group, LLC's #270 Response to Order to Show Cause by KATHERINE ARNOLD, Jeffrey Arnold, JEFF BROWNE, NEAL COLLINS, Gertrude Collins, Scott Farwick, Firenze Family Trust, William Fraser, JEANINE GORCHEN-KRASLEY, Jeanine Hilliard Gorechan, Gerald Holmes, John C Jenkins, JAMES KARG, Karen Lawrence, Richard Lester, PEGGY McCAULEY, Bob McCauley, MITCH McDONALD, PIRRO PETI, Susan Pollinger, FRANK SCHENCK, JACKLINE SLEZAK, JUDITH TALLETT, Patricia Thaxton, Stephen Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Trisha LaVeck, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Jason R. Doss)(Doss, Jason) Modified on 7/21/2020 to edit text (jpk).
July 20, 2020 Filing 311 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Response to Amended Interpleader Complaint with Brief In Support by KATHERINE ARNOLD, Jeffrey Arnold, JEFF BROWNE, NEAL COLLINS, Gertrude Collins, Scott Farwick, Firenze Family Trust, William Fraser, JEANINE GORCHEN-KRASLEY, Jeanine Hilliard Gorechan, Gerald Holmes, John C Jenkins, JAMES KARG, Karen Lawrence, Richard Lester, PEGGY McCAULEY, Bob McCauley, MITCH McDONALD, PIRRO PETI, Susan Pollinger, FRANK SCHENCK, JACKLINE SLEZAK, JUDITH TALLETT, JUDITH TALLETT, Patricia Thaxton, Stephen Thaxton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doss, Jason)
July 16, 2020 Filing 310 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Stephen J. Jones. Clerk to follow-up by 7/27/2020. (cdg)
July 16, 2020 Filing 309 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Leonard Benowich. Clerk to follow-up by 7/27/2020. (cdg)
July 15, 2020 Filing 308 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Dayton Peter Haigney, III. Clerk to follow-up by 7/27/2020. (cdg)
July 15, 2020 Filing 307 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Michael J. Slocum. Clerk to follow-up by 7/27/2020. (cdg)
July 15, 2020 Filing 306 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Lavina A. Acaru. Clerk to follow-up by 7/27/2020. (cdg)
July 15, 2020 Filing 305 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to John W. Shanklin, II. Clerk to follow-up by 7/27/2020. (cdg)
July 15, 2020 Filing 304 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Gregory P. Cronin. Clerk to follow-up by 7/27/2020. (cdg)
July 15, 2020 Filing 303 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Melinda Steuer. Clerk to follow-up by 7/27/2020. (cdg)
July 15, 2020 Filing 302 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Michael A. Starvaggi. Clerk to follow-up by 7/27/2020. (cdg)
July 13, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to DAWN VAUGHN, Daniel Nola, Dayton P. Haigney, Deldeirdra Webb, Jill Ann Purkey, Kimberly burks, Micaela Rogers, Michael J. Slocum, Orvis Tully, TERRI SALTZMAN, and Winston Harris re #301 Notice (Other). (jpk)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 301 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 13, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Webb, Voughn, Nola, Haigney, Purkey, Burks, Rogers, Slocum, Tally, Saltzman and Harris as to Ferrum II, LLC, Winston Harris, Daniel Nola, Provident Trust Group, Jill Ann Purkey, Micaela Rogers, TERRI SALTZMAN, Orvis Tully, DAWN VAUGHN, DAWN VAUGHN, Deldeirdra Webb, Kimberly Burks re #299 Order Reassigning Case. (dob)
July 10, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Webb, Voughn, Nola, Haigney, Purkey, Burks, Rogers, Slocum, Tally, Saltzman and Harris as to Ferrum II, LLC, Winston Harris, Daniel Nola, Provident Trust Group, Jill Ann Purkey, Micaela Rogers, TERRI SALTZMAN, Orvis Tully, DAWN VAUGHN, DAWN VAUGHN, Deldeirdra Webb, Kimberly Burks re #300 Order. (mlb)
July 10, 2020 Filing 300 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Eleanor L. Ross for all further proceedings. Judge Mark H. Cohen no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:20-cv-2818-ELR. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/9/2020. (dob)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 298 MINUTE ORDER granting #296 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew T. Hambleton; and granting #297 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan M. Robbin by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on July 9, 2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb)
July 9, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #297 APPLICATION for Admission of Jonathan M Robbin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9883937).. Attorney Jonathan M. Robbin added appearing on behalf of Collins Asset Group, LLC,(cdg)
July 9, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #296 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew T Hambelton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9883926).. Attorney Andrew T. Hambelton added appearing on behalf of Collins Asset Group, LLC, (cdg)
July 7, 2020 Filing 297 APPLICATION for Admission of Jonathan M Robbin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9883937).by Collins Asset Group, LLC, Collins Asset Group, LLC, Collins Asset Group, LLC. (Kastorf, Kurt) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 7, 2020 Filing 296 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew T Hambelton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9883926).by Collins Asset Group, LLC, Collins Asset Group, LLC, Collins Asset Group, LLC. (Kastorf, Kurt) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 7, 2020 Filing 295 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt G. Kastorf on behalf of Collins Asset Group, LLC (Kastorf, Kurt)
July 7, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to all Parties not electronically notified re #294 Order. (jta)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 294 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/7/2020. (jta)
July 7, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to all Parties not electronically notified re #293 Order of Recusal. (dob)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Clarence Cooper recused. Case reassigned to Judge Mark H. Cohen for all further proceedings NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:20-cv-2818-MHC. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 7/7/2020. (dob)
July 6, 2020 Filing 292 NOTICE of Related Case by KATHERINE ARNOLD, Jeffrey Arnold, JEFF BROWNE, NEAL COLLINS, Gertrude Collins, Scott Farwick, Firenze Family Trust, William Fraser, JEANINE GORCHEN-KRASLEY, Jeanine Hilliard Gorechan, Gerald Holmes, JAMES KARG, Karen Lawrence, Richard Lester, PIRRO PETI, Susan Pollinger, FRANK SCHENCK, JACKLINE SLEZAK, JUDITH TALLETT, Patricia Thaxton, Stephen Thaxton (Doss, Jason) Modified on 7/7/2020 to edit text (dob).
July 6, 2020 Filing 291 Letter Requesting Telephonic Conference on Order to Show Cause by Collins Asset Group, LLC (Kastorf, Kurt) Modified on 7/7/2020 to edit event selected (dob).
July 6, 2020 Filing 290 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:20-cv-00942. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 29, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of Georgia.(ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff and counsel for a number of the interpleader defendants, Jason R. Doss, Michael James Slocum, Leonard Alan Benowich, Lavinia Andreea Acaru, Collin Hatcher, John W. Shanklin II, and Michael Anthony Starvaggi, appeared telephonically at 1:00 p.m. today. Oral argument was had on the record. For the reasons indicated on the record and law cited therein, I am transferring this action to the United States District Court, Northern District of Georgia (Atlanta). The Order to Show Cause and papers upon which it is based (Doc. 33) remains undecided and sub judice. The time for the interpleader defendants named in Docs. 105, 107, 262, 272, 278, and 288 to answer or otherwise move with respect to the Amended Complaint is adjourned pending further order of the Court to which this action is being transferred, the Northern District of Georgia (Atlanta). Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed transfer this action to the United States District Court, Northern District of Georgia (Atlanta) and administratively close this case. SO-ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 6/29/2020) (ks) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Philip M. Halpern: Show Cause Hearing held telephonically on 6/29/2020. Counsel for plaintiff and counsel for a number of the interpleader defendants, Jason R. Doss, Michael James Slocum, Leonard Alan Benowich, Lavinia Andreea Acaru, Collin Hatcher, John W. Shanklin II, and Michael Anthony Starvaggi, appeared by telephone. Case to be transferred to United States District Court, Northern District of Georgia (Atlanta). Order to follow. (Court Reporter Steven Griffing) (sbh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER granting #284 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. The time for defendants to answer or otherwise move with respect to the amended complaint is adjourned pending further Order of the Court. Defendants are further permitted to join in the previously filed Memorandum in Opposition (Doc. 270). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 6/29/2020) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 287 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #263 Order to Show Cause,,,,. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Robbin, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 286 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #33 Order to Show Cause,,,,, . Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Hambelton, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 285 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Michael Crossan in Support re: #33 Order to Show Cause,,,,,. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Diversified Notes 2014, #2 Exhibit A-2 Diversified Notes 2015, #3 Exhibit A-3 Diversified Notes 2015, #4 Exhibit A-4 Diversified Notes 2016, #5 Exhibit A-5 Diversified Notes 2016, #6 Exhibit A-6 Diversified Notes 2016, #7 Exhibit A-7 Diversified Notes 2016, #8 Exhibit A-8 Diversified Notes 2017, #9 Exhibit B-1 Sonoqui Notes, #10 Exhibit B-2 Sonoqui Notes, #11 Exhibit B-3 Sonoqui Notes, #12 Exhibit B-4 Sonoqui Notes, #13 Exhibit B-5 Sonoqui Notes, #14 Exhibit B-6 Sonoqui Notes, #15 Exhibit C Diversified Loan Agreement, #16 Exhibit D-1 Sonoqui Loan Agrs, #17 Exhibit D-2 Sonoqui Loan Agrs, #18 Exhibit D-3 Sonoqui Loan Agrs, #19 Exhibit E Diversified Chart, #20 Exhibit F Sonoqui Chart, #21 Exhibit G Sample Note Exhibit).(Hambelton, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 284 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Response to Amended Interpleader Complaint addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Jason R. Doss dated 06262020. Document filed by Bob McCauley, Peggy McCauley..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 283 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #33 Order to Show Cause,,,,, . Document filed by Arthur Marks..(Starvaggi, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 282 NOTICE of Notice of Filing Letter-Brief In Support of Sua Sponte Transfer and Consolidation to United States District Court Northern District of Georgia re: #263 Order to Show Cause,,,,. Document filed by Jeffrey Arnold, Katherine Arnold, Jeff Browne, Gertrude Collins, Neal Collins, Scott Farwick, Firenze Family Trust, William Fraser, Jeanine Gorchen-Krasley, Jeanine Hilliard Gorechan, Gerald Holmes, John C Jenkins, James Karg, Karen Lawrence, Richard Lester, Bob McCauley, Peggy McCauley, Mitch McDonald, Pirro Peti, Susan Pollinger, Frank Schenck, Jackline Slezak, Patricia Thaxton, Stephen Thaxton..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 281 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason R Doss on behalf of Bob McCauley, Peggy McCauley..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER granting #279 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application for leave to file excess pages granted. Plaintiff's reply memorandum of law shall not exceed 25 pages. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 6/23/2020) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 279 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Omnibus Reply Brief addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Jonathan M. Robbin dated June 23, 2020. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Robbin, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 278 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #274 Letter filed by Wendy Pyne. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The time for defendant to answer or otherwise move with respect to the amended complaint is adjourned pending further Order of the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 6/23/2020) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER granting #276 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. Defendant's answer due 7/22/20. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 6/23/2020) John McCormick answer due 7/22/2020 (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 276 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Lavinia A. Acaru, Esq. dated June 22, 2020. Document filed by John McCormick..(Acaru, Lavinia) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 275 DECLARATION of Stephen J. Jones in Opposition. Document filed by Wendy Pyne..(Jones, Stephen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 274 LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Stephen J. Jones dated June 22, 2020 re: Extension of time to answer. Document filed by Wendy Pyne..(Jones, Stephen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 273 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lavinia Andreea Acaru on behalf of John McCormick..(Acaru, Lavinia) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting #269 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. The time for defendants to answer or otherwise move with respect to the amended complaint is adjourned pending further Order of the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 6/22/2020) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 271 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #268 Letter filed by Daniel Nola, ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Defendant's answer due 7/1/20. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 6/22/2020) Daniel Nola answer due 7/1/2020. (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 20, 2020 Filing 270 JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #33 Order to Show Cause,,,,, . Document filed by Jeffrey Arnold, Katherine Arnold, Jeff Browne, Kimberly Burks, Gertrude Collins, Neal Collins, Traci Cougle, Scott Farwick, John Ferguson, Firenze Family Trust, William Fraser, Jeanine Gorchen-Krasley, Jeanine Hilliard Gorechan, Winston Harris, Jacqueline Hazey, Daniel Hebert, Sharal Herbert, Gerald Holmes, John C Jenkins, James Karg, Karen Lawrence, Richard Lester, Frank Lopinto, Mitch McDonald, Keith Morales, Daniel Nola, Pirro Peti, Susan Pollinger, Jill Ann Purkey, Frank Schenck, John Brady Sessums, Judith Tallett, Patricia Thaxton, Stephen Thaxton, Orvis Tully. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Stephen Thaxton Part 1, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Stephen Thaxton Part 2, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Jason R. Doss Part 1, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Jason R. Doss Part 2, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Sandra Schenck).(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 269 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Response to Amended Interpleader Complaint addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Jason R. Doss dated 06192020. Document filed by James Karg, Pirro Peti..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 265 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason R Doss on behalf of James Karg..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 264 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason R Doss on behalf of Pirro Peti..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 268 LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Daniel Nola dated 6/18/20 re: Daniel Nola requests that the Court grant an extension of time to 7/1/20 to answer the Interpleader Complaint. Document filed by Daniel Nola.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 267 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PRO SE by Daniel Nola. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 266 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PRO SE. Document filed by Daniel Nola. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: On May 11, 2020, the Court granted the request for a pre-motion conference, scheduling it for June 29, 2020 at 1:00 p.m. to be held via telephone. (Doc. 111). The Court has reviewed the referenced submissions and, to provide the parties notice and an opportunity to be heard, hereby Orders that on June 29, 2020 at 1:00 p.m., the parties show cause why the Court should not sua sponte transfer this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia (Atlanta), in lieu of the requested motion practice. On or before June 26, 2020, the parties may proffer any additional arguments in a letter to be filed via ECF, limited to five pages in length, and submit any factual material that has not already been provided to the Court in connection with their response to this Order to Show Cause. No "reply" papers will be permitted. SO ORDERED: Show Cause Response due by 6/26/2020. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 6/16/2020) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting #259 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. The time for defendant Lester to answer or otherwise move with respect to the amended complaint is adjourned pending further Order of the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 6/15/2020) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 261 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason R Doss on behalf of Jackline Slezak..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 260 NOTICE OF PRO SEAPPEARANCE by Deldeirdra Webb. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 259 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Response to Amended Interpleader Complaint addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Jason R. Doss dated 06122020. Document filed by Richard Lester..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 258 DECLARATION of Mike Cox (Ferrum II, LLC) in Support re: #33 Order to Show Cause,,,,,. Document filed by Ferrum II, LLC..(Haigney, Dayton) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 257 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason R Doss on behalf of Richard Lester..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 256 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #250 Letter, filed by Micaela Rogers, ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Defendant's answer due 7/1/20. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 6/12/2020) Micaela Rogers answer due 7/1/2020. (ks) Modified on 6/17/2020 (ks). [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #252 Letter filed by Daniel Hebert, ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Defendant's answer due 7/1/20. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 6/12/2020) Daniel Hebert answer due 7/1/2020. (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 253 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay Sham Gabehart. (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 251 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Micaela Rogers. (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 250 LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Micaela L. Rogers dated 6/10/2020 re: I, Micaela L. Rogers, Defendant in Civil Action No. 7.20-CV-00942, request an extension of time to July 1, 2020 to answer the Interpleader Complaint. Document filed by Micaela Rogers.(jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 254 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE. by Daniel Hebert. (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 252 LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Daniel Hebert dated 6/10/2020 re: Request an extension of time to July 1, 2020 to answer the Interpleader Complaint. Document filed by Daniel Hebert.(ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #244 Letter filed by Blake Wellerman, ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Defendant's answer due 7/1/20. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 6/9/2020) Blake Wellerman answer due 7/1/2020. (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #246 Letter filed by Traci Cougle, ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Defendant's answer due 7/1/20. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 6/9/2020) Traci Cougle answer due 7/1/2020. (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 247 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Traci Cougle. (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 246 LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Traci Cougle dated Undated re: Request an extension of time to July 1, 2020 to answer the Interpleader Complaint. Document filed by Traci Cougle.(jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 245 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE. by Blake Wellerman. (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 244 LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from William B. Wellerman dated 6/06/2020 re: Extension of time to July 1, 2020 to answer the Interpleader Complaint. Document filed by Blake Wellerman.(ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #239 Letter filed by Sharal Herbert, ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Defendant's answer due 7/1/20. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 6/5/2020) Sharal Herbert answer due 7/1/2020. (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER granting #241 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. Defendant's answer due 7/1/20. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 6/5/2020) Jacqueline Hazey answer due 7/1/2020 (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 241 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #11 Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Jacquelyn Hazey dated 6/3/2020. Document filed by Jacqueline Hazey. (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 240 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Jacqueline Hazey. (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 239 LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Sharal A. Herbert dated 6/4/2020 re: Extension of time. Document filed by Sharal Herbert.(cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 238 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Sharal Herbert. (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #227 Letter filed by Frank Lopinto, ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Defendant's answer due 7/1/2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 6/3/2020) Frank Lopinto answer due 7/1/2020. (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 235 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #231 Letter filed by Orvis Tully. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. Defendant's answer due 7/1/2020. SO ORDERED., Orvis Tully answer due 7/1/2020. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 6/03/2020) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 234 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #229 Letter filed by John Brady Sessums. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. Defendant's answer due 7/01/2020. SO ORDERED., John Brady Sessums answer due 7/1/2020. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 6/03/2020) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #226 Letter filed by John Ferguson. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. Defendant's answer due 7/01/2020. SO ORDERED., John Ferguson answer due 7/1/2020. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 6/03/2020) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 237 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by John Brady Sessums..(ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 231 LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Orvis Tully dated June 1, 2020 re: letter requesting extension of time to answer. Document filed by Orvis Tully..(ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 230 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Orvis Tully..(ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 229 LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from John Brady Sessums dated 6/2/2020 re: letter requesting extension of time to answer. Document filed by John Brady Sessums..(ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 232 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by John Ferguson. (yv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 228 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE: by Frank Lopinto. (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 227 LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Frank A. Lopinto dated 5/25/2020 re: Extension of Time to Answer. Document filed by Frank Lopinto.(ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 226 LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from John Ferguson dated 5/27/20 re: extension request. Document filed by John Ferguson.(yv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 225 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Peggy McCauley served on 5/29/2020, answer due 6/19/2020. Service was accepted by Bob McCauley, Husband. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 224 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Bob McCauley served on 5/30/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. Service was accepted by Bob McCauley. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 1, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #221 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,, #222 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,, was reviewed and referred to Judge Philip M. Halpern for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (ad) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting #164 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 Amended Complaint. Application granted. Defendant's answer due 7/1/2020. (Arthur Marks answer due 7/1/2020.) (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 6/1/2020) (rro)[Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 222 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) David Ernest, David Evans, Debbie Evans, Evans Family Trust. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Robbin, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 221 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Terri Saltzman. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Robbin, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 220 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Yu Zhang served on 3/23/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. Service was accepted by Yu Zhang. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 219 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Yiling Shi served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. Service was accepted by "Jane Doe" Refused to Give Name at the Residence. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 218 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Yanbo Jiang served on 3/20/2020, answer due 4/10/2020. Service was accepted by Carl Jiang. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 217 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Xio Yun Pan served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. Service was accepted by Ming Pan. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 216 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Winston Harris served on 3/17/2020, answer due 7/1/2020. Service was accepted by Winston Harris. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 215 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. William Fraser waiver sent on 4/2/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 214 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Service was accepted by Charlie Pyne, Husband. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 213 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Venetia Lappas served on 3/18/2020, answer due 4/8/2020. Service was accepted by Venetia Lappas. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 212 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Vantage Retirement Plans, LLC served on 4/29/2020, answer due 5/20/2020. Service was made by FexEx.. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 211 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Trish Laveck served on 4/3/2020, answer due 4/24/2020. Service was accepted by Trish Laveck. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 210 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Traci Cougle served on 3/28/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. Service was made by Posted to Door. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 209 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Tom Chrisman served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. Service was accepted by Tom Chrisman. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 208 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Thomas Denton served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/7/2020. Service was accepted by Thomas Denton. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 207 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Terry McKnight served on 4/29/2020, answer due 5/20/2020. Service was made by FedEx. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 206 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Susan Pollinger served on 3/24/2020, answer due 4/14/2020. Service was accepted by Susan Pollinger. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 205 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Stephen Thaxton waiver sent on 3/9/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 204 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Sonoqui, LLC served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. Service was accepted by Suzanne Hawkes, Secretary of State. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 203 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Sherrie George served on 4/10/2020, answer due 5/1/2020. Service was accepted by Sherri George. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 202 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Sharal Herbert served on 3/23/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. Service was accepted by Sharal Herbert. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 201 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Scott Havenor served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/7/2020. Service was accepted by Scott Havenor. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 200 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Scott Farwick served on 3/19/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. Service was accepted by Scott Farwick. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 199 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Scott Farwick waiver sent on 4/13/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 198 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Wendy Pyne served on 3/23/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. Service was accepted by Charlie Pyne, Husband. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 197 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Richard Lester served on 5/27/2020, answer due 6/17/2020. Service was accepted by Jane Lester, Wife. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 196 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Randall Bahjat served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. Service was accepted by Randall Bahjat. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 195 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Provident Trust Group served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/7/2020. Service was accepted by Justine Augustine, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 194 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Pirro Peti served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/7/2020. Service was accepted by Pirro Peti. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 193 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Peina Wang served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/7/2020. Service was accepted by Peina Wang. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 192 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Patricia Thaxton waiver sent on 3/9/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 191 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Orvis Tully served on 4/29/2020, answer due 5/20/2020. Service was made by FedEx. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 190 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Neal Collins. Attempted Service of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Service was attempted on 3/23/20. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 189 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Neal Collins waiver sent on 3/23/2020, answer due 5/22/2020. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 188 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Mitch McDonald waiver sent on 4/2/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 187 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Micaela Rogers served on 4/29/2020, answer due 5/20/2020. Service was made by FedEx. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 186 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Mark Poulsen served on 3/23/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. Service was accepted by Mark Poulsen. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 185 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Marie Johnson served on 4/29/2020, answer due 5/20/2020. Service was made by FedEx. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 184 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Lory Williams served on 3/19/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. Service was accepted by Brian Williams, Spouse. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 183 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Lian He served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. Service was accepted by Lian He. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 182 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Leonard Kleinpeter served on 3/25/2020, answer due 4/15/2020. Service was accepted by Leonard Kleinpeter. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 181 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Kimberly Burks served on 4/29/2020, answer due 7/1/2020. Service was made by FedEx. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 180 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Keith Morales served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/7/2020. Service was accepted by Angela Morales, Wife. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 179 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Katherine Arnold waiver sent on 4/13/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 178 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Karen Lawrence served on 4/16/2020, answer due 5/7/2020. Service was accepted by Karen Lawrence. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 177 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Judith Tallett waiver sent on 4/2/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 176 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. John McCormick served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. Service was accepted by John McCormick. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 175 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. John C Jenkins waiver sent on 4/13/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 174 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. John Ferguson served on 3/25/2020, answer due 4/15/2020. Service was accepted by John Ferguson. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 173 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. John C Jenkins served on 3/20/2020, answer due 4/10/2020. Service was accepted by Jonathan Jenkins, Son. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 172 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. John Brady Sessums served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/7/2020. Service was accepted by Lizzy Sessums, Daughter. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 171 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Jin Li served on 4/20/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. Service was accepted by Jin Li. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 170 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Jill Ann Purkey served on 3/17/2020, answer due 7/1/2020. Service was accepted by Winston Harris, Spouse. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 169 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jeffrey Arnold waiver sent on 4/13/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 168 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Jeff Mullis served on 4/29/2020, answer due 5/20/2020. Service was made by FedEx. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 167 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Jeff Browne served on 3/19/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. Service was accepted by Jeff Browne. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 166 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jeff Browne waiver sent on 4/13/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 165 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Jeanine Hilliard Gorechan served on 3/19/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. Service was accepted by Branko Gorechan, Spouse. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 164 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Michael A. Starvaggi, Esq. dated May 29, 2020. Document filed by Arthur Marks..(Starvaggi, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 163 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jeanine Gorchen-Krasley waiver sent on 3/23/2020, answer due 5/22/2020. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 162 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Service was accepted by Attempt Service/Defendant Moved.. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 161 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Jacqueline Hazey served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. Service was accepted by Jacqueline Hazey. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 160 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Jackline Slezak served on 3/31/2020, answer due 4/21/2020. Service was accepted by Jackline Slezak. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 159 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. James Lappas served on 3/18/2020, answer due 4/8/2020. Service was accepted by Venefia Lappas. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 158 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. James Karg served on 4/29/2020, answer due 5/20/2020. Service was made by FedEx. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 157 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Hongbin Li served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/7/2020. Service was accepted by Hong Yu, Co-Resident. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 156 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Hong Yu served on 3/18/2020, answer due 4/8/2020. Service was accepted by Hong Yu. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 155 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Harold Likey served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. Service was accepted by Lynn Likey, Spouse. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 154 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Service was made by Attempted Service/Non-Service. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 153 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Gregory Tindall served on 3/21/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. Service was accepted by Gregory Tindall. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 152 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Gertrude Collins. Attempted Service of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Service was attempted on 3/21/20. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 151 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Gertrude Collins waiver sent on 3/23/2020, answer due 5/22/2020. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 150 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Gerald Holmes served on 4/23/2020, answer due 5/14/2020. Service was accepted by Gerald Holmes. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 149 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Frank Schenck served on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/22/2020. Service was accepted by Frank Scherick. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 148 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Frank Lopinto served on 3/25/2020, answer due 4/15/2020. Service was accepted by Frank LoPinto. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 147 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Frank Schenck waiver sent on 3/23/2020, answer due 5/22/2020. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 146 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Francis Early served on 3/21/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. Service was accepted by Francis Early. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 145 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Firenze Family Trust served on 3/17/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. Service was accepted by Bridgette Firenze. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 144 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Firenze Family Trust waiver sent on 4/13/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 143 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Fei Havenor served on 3/18/2020, answer due 4/8/2020. Service was accepted by Fei Havenor. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 142 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Ernesto DiGiordano served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. Service was accepted by Ernesto DiGiordano. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 141 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Donna Peters served on 3/21/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. Service was accepted by Donna Peters. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 140 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Diversified Financing, LLC served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. Service was accepted by Suzanne Hawkes, Secretary of State. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 139 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Diane Denton served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/7/2020. Service was accepted by Tom Denton, Husband. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 138 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Deldeirdra Webb served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/7/2020. Service was accepted by Raymond Webb, Jr.. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 137 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Dawn Vaughn served on 3/26/2020, answer due 4/16/2020. Service was accepted by Dawn Vaugh. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 136 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. David Ernest served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. Service was accepted by David Ernest. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 135 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Daniel Hebert served on 4/29/2020, answer due 5/20/2020. Service was accepted by Angelle Hebert, Wife. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 134 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Dan Nolan served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/7/2020. Service was accepted by Alllison Nola, Wife. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 133 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Cathy Kaiser served on 3/23/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. Service was accepted by Cathy Kaiser. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 132 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Carlise Stargill served on 4/29/2020, answer due 5/20/2020. Service was made by FexEx. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 131 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Brian Wilson served on 4/29/2020, answer due 5/20/2020. Service was accepted by FedEx. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 130 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Brad Van served on 3/28/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. Service was accepted by Shawn Van, Son. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 129 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Blake Wellerman served on 3/31/2020, answer due 4/21/2020. Service was made by /Posted at Residence. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 128 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Arthur Marks served on 3/19/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. Service was accepted by Lynda Marks, Spouse. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 127 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,, served. Ang Li served on 4/23/2020, answer due 5/14/2020. Service was made by Left at the address and Mailed. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 126 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Amy Huang served on 4/28/2020, answer due 5/19/2020. Service was accepted by Defendant Amy Huang. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #122 Letter, filed by Winston Harris, ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Defendant's answer due 7/1/20. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 5/28/2020) Winston Harris answer due 7/1/2020. (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #121 Letter, filed by Jill Ann Purkey, ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Defendant's answer due 7/1/20. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 5/28/2020) Jill Ann Purkey answer due 7/1/2020. (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #118 Letter filed by Kimberly Burks, ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Defendant's answer due 7/1/20. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 5/27/2020) Kimberly Burks answer due 7/1/2020. (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 122 LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Winston E. Harris dated 5/27/2020 re: I, Winston E. Harris, Defendant in Civil Action No. 7. 20-CV-942 request an extension of time to July l, 2020 to answer the Interpleader Complaint. Document filed by Winston Harris. (js) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 121 LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Jill Ann Purkey dated 5/27/2020 re: I, Jill Ann Purkey, Defendant in Civil Action No. 7.20-CV-00942, request an extension of time to July 1, 2020 to answer the Interpleader Complaint. Document filed by Jill Ann Purkey. (js) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 120 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Jill Ann Purkey. (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 119 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Winston Harris. (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 118 LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Kimberly Burks dated 5/26/2020 re: extension of time to answer Interpleader Complaint. Document filed by Kimberly Burks.(rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 117 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Kimberly Burks. (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Mailed Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment to litigant. (nd) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 116 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Justin Jones, I on behalf of Wendy Pyne..(Jones, Stephen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #115 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Philip M. Halpern for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (ad) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 115 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Marie Johnson. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Robbin, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 114 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason R Doss on behalf of Marie Johnson..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 113 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Collin Hatcher on behalf of Francis Early..(Hatcher, Collin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #108 Motion for Collin D. Hatcher to Appear Pro Hac Vice. After reviewing the motion and accompanying documents, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Collin D. Hatcher's motion for admission pro hac vice is GRANTED.. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 5/11/2020) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #103 Letter Motion for Conference. Application granted. A conference is scheduled for 6/29/20 at 1:00 p.m. to be held via telephone. At the time of the scheduled conference, all parties shall call the following number: (888) 398-2342; access code 3456831. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 5/11/2020) Telephone Conference set for 6/29/2020 at 01:00 PM before Judge Philip M. Halpern. (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 110 LETTER RESPONSE in Support of Motion addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Leonard Benowich dated May 8, 2020 re: #103 LETTER MOTION for Conference related to Motion to Transfer Case addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Jason R. Doss dated 05032020. . Document filed by Luis San Miguel, Olivia San Miguel..(Benowich, Leonard) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 109 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Jonathan M. Robbin dated May 8, 2020 re: #103 LETTER MOTION for Conference related to Motion to Transfer Case addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Jason R. Doss dated 05032020. . Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Robbin, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 8, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #108 MOTION for Collin Day Hatcher to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19760187. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 108 MOTION for Collin Day Hatcher to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19760187. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Francis Early. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Hatcher, Collin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #106 Letter filed by Francis Early. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Defendant Early's response to amended complaint is adjourned pending further Order of the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 5/7/2020) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 106 LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Russell D. King dated 5/06/20 re: Deadline to file an Answer or Response to Plaintiff's Interpleader Complaint. Document filed by Francis Early..(King, Russell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #102 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. Responses of interpleader defendants named herein to amended complaint is adjourned pending further Order of the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 5/4/2020) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 104 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Pivot Acquisition Sub, Inc., Corporate Parent Ascensus Group, LLC for Provident Trust Group. Document filed by Provident Trust Group..(Slocum, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
May 3, 2020 Filing 103 LETTER MOTION for Conference related to Motion to Transfer Case addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Jason R. Doss dated 05032020. Document filed by Jeffrey Arnold, Katherine Arnold, Jeff Browne, Gertrude Collins, Neal Collins, Scott Farwick, William Fraser, Jeanine Gorchen-Krasley, Jeanine Hilliard Gorechan, Gerald Holmes, John C Jenkins, Karen Lawrence, Mitch McDonald, Susan Pollinger, Frank Schenck, Judith Tallett, Patricia Thaxton, Stephen Thaxton..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 102 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Response to Amended Interpleader Complaint addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Jason R. Doss dated 04302020. Document filed by Jeffrey Arnold, Katherine Arnold, Jeff Browne, Gertrude Collins, Neal Collins, Scott Farwick, Firenze Family Trust, William Fraser, Jeanine Gorchen-Krasley, Jeanine Hilliard Gorechan, Gerald Holmes, John C Jenkins, Karen Lawrence, Mitch McDonald, Susan Pollinger, Frank Schenck, Judith Tallett, Patricia Thaxton, Stephen Thaxton..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 101 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition . Document filed by Francis Early. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(King, Russell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 100 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #33 Order to Show Cause,,,,, . Document filed by Provident Trust Group. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Molnar).(Slocum, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 99 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Provident Trust Group..(Slocum, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 98 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason R Doss on behalf of Susan Pollinger..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 97 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason R Doss on behalf of Jeffrey Arnold, Katherine Arnold..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 96 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason R Doss on behalf of Gerald Holmes..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 95 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Russell D. King on behalf of Francis Early..(King, Russell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 6/22/2020 Replies due by 6/26/2020. Service due by 6/1/2020. (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #72 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; granting #88 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's application is granted as follows: (i) plaintiff is granted leave to serve the twelve Defendants set forth herein by Overnight Mail; (ii) the time to effectuate service on all defendants is extended to 6/1/20; (iii) opposition papers are to be filed by 6/22/20, and reply papers may be filed by 6/26/20. The return date of the Order to Show Cause is adjourned to 6/26/20 and there will be no appearances on the return date. Plaintiff shall contact all previously served defendants to advise of this Order. The Clerk is requested to terminate the letter-motions (Docs. 72 and 88). SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 4/27/2020) (ks). Modified on 4/29/2020 (ks). [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 93 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #33 Order to Show Cause,,,,, ., DECLARATION . Document filed by Luis San Miguel, Olivia San Miguel..(Benowich, Leonard) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 92 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason R Doss on behalf of Karen Lawrence..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Francis Early answer due 6/1/2020. (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #90 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Application granted. Interpleader defendant Francis Early's response to the Amended Complaint due 6/1/20. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 4/24/2020) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 90 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Russell D. King dated 04/24/20. Document filed by Francis Early..(King, Russell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #86 Motion for Russell D. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 4/23/2020) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 88 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve And For Service By Alternative Methods And To Provide A Status Update on Service addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Jonathan M. Robbin dated April 23, 2020. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Robbin, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 22, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #87 MOTION for Collin D. Hatcher to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19539417. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The certificate of Good Standing must be issued from the Supreme Court of Alabama Clerk's Office, 300 Dexter Avenue, Montgomery, AL 36104 334-242-4609;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (ad) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 87 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PRO HAC VICE MOTION - MOTION for Collin D. Hatcher to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19539417. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Francis Early. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Hatcher, Collin) Modified on 4/22/2020 (ad). [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 22, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #86 MOTION for Russell D. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19538988. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 86 MOTION for Russell D. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19538988. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Francis Early. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(King, Russell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 85 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Jackline Slezak..(ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER with respect to #72 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. On or before 4/23/20 at 5:00 p.m., plaintiff shall file a letter via ECF identifying each defendant that still needs to be served and what plaintiff proposes as to each such defendant, supported by good cause in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 4/20/2020) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Gregory Tindall answer due 6/1/2020; Lory Williams answer due 6/1/2020. (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #80 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Application granted. Interpleader defendants Gregory Tindall and Lory Williams responses to the Amended Complaint due 6/1/20. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 4/20/2020) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME: It is HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the attorneys for the parties herein that the time for Interpleader Defendant, Arthur Marks, to answer or otherwise respond to the Interpleader Summons and Complaint shall be, and hereby is, extended to and including June 1, 2020. (As further set forth in this Order.) Arthur Marks answer due 6/1/2020., Motions terminated: #78 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Michael A. Starvaggi dated April 16, 2020. filed by Arthur Marks. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 4/17/2020) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #76 Motion for Melinda Jane Steuer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 4/17/2020) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 80 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Melinda Jane Steuer dated April 17, 2020. Document filed by Gregory Tindall..(Steuer, Melinda) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 79 LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Leonard Benowich dated April 17, 2020 re: Plaintiff's Request for Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Luis San Miguel, Olivia San Miguel..(Benowich, Leonard) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 78 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Michael A. Starvaggi dated April 16, 2020. Document filed by Arthur Marks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation).(Starvaggi, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Anthony Starvaggi on behalf of Arthur Marks..(Starvaggi, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 16, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #76 MOTION for Melinda Jane Steuer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 76 MOTION for Melinda Jane Steuer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Lory Williams. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Cert. Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Steuer, Melinda) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE of MOTIONS. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4)(cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE of Request for Judicial Notice re: #33 Order to Show Cause,,,,,. Document filed by Gregory Tindall..(Steuer, Melinda) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #33 Order to Show Cause,,,,, . Document filed by Gregory Tindall..(Steuer, Melinda) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 72 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve and For Leave to Serve Via Alternative Service addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Jonathan M. Robbin dated April 15, 2020. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Robbin, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #70 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. Interpleader Defendant the Firenze Family Trust's response to the Amended Complaint is due 6/1/20. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 4/13/2020) Firenze Family Trust answer due 6/1/2020 (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 70 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Response to Amended Interpleader Complaint addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Jason R. Doss dated 04102020. Document filed by Firenze Family Trust..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason R Doss on behalf of Firenze Family Trust..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #64 Status Report filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff is directed to file a pre-motion letter on or before 4/15/20, in accordance with Rule 2(c) of my Individual Practices, in connection with its request for leave to serve via an alternative method of service and for an extension of time to serve, providing the Court with the necessary factual and legal prerequisites in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 4/10/20) (yv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #66 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. Interpleader Defendant Scott Farwick's response to the Amended Complaint is due 6/1/20. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 4/9/2020) Scott Farwick answer due 6/1/2020 (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Filing 66 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Response to Amended Interpleader Complaint addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Jason R. Doss dated 04082020. Document filed by Scott Farwick..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason R Doss on behalf of Scott Farwick..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Filing 64 STATUS REPORT. As to the status of Service of Process Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Robbin, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #62 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. These Interpleader Defendants' responses to the Amended Complaint are due 6/1/20. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 4/8/2020) Jeff Browne answer due 6/1/2020; Gertrude Collins answer due 6/1/2020; Neal Collins answer due 6/1/2020; William Fraser answer due 6/1/2020; Jeanine Gorchen-Krasley answer due 6/1/2020; Jeanine Hilliard Gorechan answer due 6/1/2020; John C Jenkins answer due 6/1/2020; Mitch McDonald answer due 6/1/2020; Frank Schenck answer due 6/1/2020; Judith Tallett answer due 6/1/2020; Patricia Thaxton answer due 6/1/2020; Stephen Thaxton answer due 6/1/2020 (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 62 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Response to Amended Interpleader Complaint addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Jason R. Doss dated 4/6/2020. Document filed by Jeff Browne, Gertrude Collins, Neal Collins, William Fraser, Jeanine Gorchen-Krasley, Jeanine Hilliard Gorechan, John C Jenkins, Mitch McDonald, Frank Schenck, Judith Tallett, Patricia Thaxton, Stephen Thaxton..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #58 Motion for Melinda Jane Steuer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 4/3/2020) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason R Doss on behalf of William Fraser..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason R Doss on behalf of John C Jenkins..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 1, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #58 MOTION for Melinda Jane Steuer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19301584. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION for Melinda Jane Steuer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19301584. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gregory Tindall. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Cert Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Steuer, Melinda) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason R Doss on behalf of Judith Tallett..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 26, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #56 MOTION for Melinda Jane Steuer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the certificate of good standing must be from California Supreme Court 350 Mc Allister Street Room 1295 San Francisco, CA 94102 415-865-7000;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (ad) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 56 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PRO HAC VICE MOTION - MOTION for Melinda Jane Steuer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gregory Tindall. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Cert. Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Steuer, Melinda) Modified on 3/26/2020 (ad). [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Notice of Withdrawal of Letter Motion [Dkt. 42] re: #42 Notice (Other). Document filed by Patricia Thaxton, Stephen Thaxton..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 4/29/2020 Replies due by 5/4/2020. Service due by 4/8/2020. Show Cause Response due by 5/11/2020. (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #51 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The application is granted. Plaintiffs time to serve the defendants or their counsel is extended to 4/8/20. Opposition papers are to be filed by 4/29/20, and reply papers may be filed by 5/4/20. The return date of the Order to Show Cause (Doc. 33) is adjourned to 5/11/20 and there will be no appearances on the return date. Plaintiff shall contact all previously served defendants to advise of this Order, and shall file a letter on or before 4/8/20 advising the Court of the status of service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 3/25/2020) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason R Doss on behalf of Jeff Browne..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason R Doss on behalf of Mitch McDonald..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 51 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Providing Update On And To Complete Service Of Process addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Jonathan M. Robbin dated March 24, 2020. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Robbin, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason R Doss on behalf of Gertrude Collins, Neal Collins..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason R Doss on behalf of Jeanine Gorchen-Krasley..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason R Doss on behalf of Frank Schenck..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason R Doss on behalf of Patricia Thaxton, Stephen Thaxton..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The application is granted. Plaintiff's opposition to Pre-motion Letter due 3/27/2020. Clerk of Court is requested to terminate the letter motion (Doc. 45). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 3/20/2020) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 45 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Interpleader Defendant Thaxtons' Pre-Motion Letter addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Jonathan M. Robbin dated 3/20/2020. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Robbin, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER : Consistent with the Court's recent standing orders restricting access to the courthouse, effective immediately, all conferences in all civil cases assigned to Judge Halpern shall be conducted by telephone conference call. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, counsel and unrepresented parties shall not attend court in person. It will be the responsibility of counsel to arrange a conference call. At the time of the scheduled conference, once all counsel (and unrepresented parties) are on the line, they shall call Chambers at the following number: (914) 390-4160. This Order is subject to revocation at any time. In that event, the Court will notify counsel (and unrepresented parties) sufficiently in advance of the scheduled conference to allow participants to attend Court in person. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 3/18/2020) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leonard Alan Benowich on behalf of Luis San Miguel, Olivia San Miguel..(Benowich, Leonard) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 17, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Judge Cathy Seibel is no longer assigned to the case. (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Letter to Judge Cathy Seibel dated March 13, 2020. Document filed by Patricia Thaxton, Stephen Thaxton..(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John W. Shanklin, II on behalf of Ferrum II, LLC..(Shanklin, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Jonathan M. Robbin in Support re: #33 Order to Show Cause,,,,,. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Letter dated 03/06/2020, #2 Exhibit B- Letter dated 03/09/2020).(Robbin, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Michael Crossan in Support re: #33 Order to Show Cause,,,,,. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-First Amended Complaint., #2 Exhibit B-Thaxton Federal Court Class Complaint 022920, #3 Exhibit C-Thaxton Emergency Motion.).(Robbin, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #33 Order to Show Cause,,,,, . Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Robbin, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 40 ANSWER to #7 Complaint. Document filed by Jackline Slezak.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PRO SE by Jackline Slezak. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 38 ANSWER OF DEFENDANT VAUGHN, re: to #7 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Collins Asset Group, LLC. Document filed by Dawn Vaughn.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PRO SE by Dawn Vaughn. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 4/20/2020. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: Defendants shall show cause as to why an order should not be issued: (i) directing CAG to deposit the stake at issue in this action into the Registry of the Court, (ii) directing defendants to interplead their claims related to the stake at issue in this action; (iii) restraining and enjoining defendants and potential defendants from instituting or prosecuting any proceeding in any court that affects or may affect the stake at issue in this action other than with this Court; (iv) discharging CAG from any further liability with respect to the stake at issue in this action; (v) awarding CAG its attorneys' fees and costs in connection with this action; and (vi) granting CAG any such other and further relief as the Court deems just and proper. ORDERED that opposition papers are due to be filed by 4/15/20, and reply papers may be filed by 4/20, and it is further ORDERED that personal service of a copy of this order and the papers on which it is based upon the defendants or their counsel on or before 3/25/2020. SO ORDERED. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/27/2020 at 03:30 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel. Show Cause Response due by 4/15/2020. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 3/11/2020) (mml) Modified on 3/12/2020 (mml). [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Show Cause Hearing held on 3/11/2020. The Court signs the Order to Show Cause and STRIKES the TRO (Temporary Restraining Order). The Court directs the Defendant(s) to file any papers by April 10, 2020. The Court also directs Plaintiff to serve Order to Show Cause along with accompanying papers to any Defendant(s) that have not been served yet by 5:00 p.m. on March 25, 2020. Defendant(s) to file their opposition papers by April 15, 2020 and Plaintiff to file their reply papers by April 20, 2020. The Court sets this Order to Show Cause returnable on April 27, 2020 at 3:30 p.m. See transcript. (Show Cause Hearing set for 4/27/2020 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel). (Court Reporter Christina Arends-Dieck) (wc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #28 Motion for JOHN W. SHANKLIN II to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Jason Ryan Doss to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 11, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #28 MOTION for JOHN W. SHANKLIN II to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19075066. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for JOHN W. SHANKLIN II to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19075066. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ferrum II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of John W. Shanklin, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Pro Hac Vice Order).(Haigney, Dayton) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 11, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #27 MOTION for Jason Ryan Doss to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Pro Se by Jeff Browne. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to #7 Complaint. Document filed by Jeff Browne.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Jason Ryan Doss to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Patricia Thaxton, Stephen Thaxton. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Doss, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 10, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #26 MOTION for Jason Ryan Doss to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19064518. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida; missing Proposed Order. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 26 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jason Ryan Doss to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19064518. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Patricia Thaxton, Stephen Thaxton. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit).(Doss, Jason) Modified on 3/10/2020 (aea). [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 25 LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jonathan M. Robbin dated March 9, 2020 re: Letter In Response to Jason Doss Letter Dated March 9th. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Robbin, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jason R. Doss dated 3/9/2020 re: We respectfully request that this Court require Collins Asset Group to send a court approved notice rescinding the March 6th letter and properly advising putative class members of their legal rights. ENDORSEMENT: This is the first the Court is hearing of this. It is not clear to me if Plaintiff is going to seek any emergency relief with its Order to Show Cause or if it will simply be asking me to tee up an issue for Defendants to respond. If the former, the parties should be aware that I do not grant emergency relief ex parte without a good reason. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 3/9/2020) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to #7 Complaint. Document filed by Mitch McDonald.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Pro Se by Mitch McDonald(Mitchell T. MacDonald). (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #7 Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIM against Collins Asset Group, LLC. Document filed by Judith Tallett.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Pro Se by Judith Tallett. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Ferrum II, LLC..(Haigney, Dayton) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ferrum II, LLC..(Haigney, Dayton) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dayton Peter Haigney, III on behalf of Ferrum II, LLC..(Haigney, Dayton) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #7 Complaint. Document filed by Terri Saltzman.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Pro Se by Terri Saltzman.(sc) Modified on 3/5/2020 (sc). [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeffrey Arnold, Katherine Arnold, Randall Bahjat, Jeff Browne, Kimberly Burks, Tom Chrisman, Gertrude Collins, Neal Collins, Traci Cougle, Diane Denton, Thomas Denton, Ernesto DiGiordano, Diversified Financing, LLC, Francis Early, David Ernest, David Evans, Debbie Evans, Evans Family Trust, David Farwick, Scott Farwick, John Ferguson, Ferrum II, LLC, Firenze Family Trust, William Fraser, Jay Sham Gabehart, Sherrie George, Jeanine Gorchen-Krasley, Jeanine Hilliard Gorechan, Winston Harris, Fei Havenor, Scott Havenor, Jacqueline Hazey, Lian He, Daniel Hebert, Sharal Herbert, Gerald Holmes, Amy Huang, IRA Services Trust Company, John C Jenkins, Yanbo Jiang, Marie Johnson, Cathy Kaiser, James Karg, Leonard Kleinpeter, James Lappas, Venetia Lappas, Trish Laveck, Karen Lawrence, Richard Lester, Ang Li, Hongbin Li, Jin Li, Harold Likey, Frank Lopinto, Arthur Marks, Peggy McCauley, John McCormick, Mitch McDonald, Terry McKnight, Keith Morales, Jeff Mullis, Hanh Nguyen, Dan Nolan, Donna Peters, Pirro Peti, Susan Pollinger, Mark Poulsen, Provident Trust Group, Jill Ann Purkey, Wendy Pyne, Micaela Rogers, Terri Saltzman, Luis San Miguel, Olivia San Miguel, Frank Schenck, John Brady Sessums, Yiling Shi, Jackline Slezak, Sonoqui, LLC, Carlise Stargill, Judith Tallett, Patricia Thaxton, Stephen Thaxton, Gregory Tindall, Orvis Tully, Brad Van, Vantage Retirement Plans, LLC, Dawn Vaughn, Peina Wang, Karen Warren, Deldeirdra Webb, Blake Wellerman, Lory Williams, Brian Wilson, Hong Yu, Xio Yun Pan, Yu Zhang, Bill Zoellin..(dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory P. Cronin on behalf of Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Cronin, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 4, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jonathan M. Robbin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Sharal Hebert, Xaio Yun Pan, Wintson Harris. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to DIVERSIFIED FINANCING, LLC; SONOQUI, LLC; IRA SERVICES TRUST COMPANY; FERRUM II, LLC; PROVIDENT TRUST GROUP; VANTAGE RETIREMENT PLANS, LLC; JEFFREY ARNOLD; KATHERINE ARNOLD; RANDALL BAHJAT; JEFF BROWNE; KIMBERLY BURKS; TOM CHRISMAN; GERTRUDE COLLINS; NEAL COLLINS; TRACI COUGLE; DIANE DENTON; THOMAS DENTON; ERNESTO DIGIORDANO; FRANCIS EARLY; DAVID ERNEST; DEBBIE EVANS; DAVID EVANS; EVANS FAMILY TRUST; SCOTT FARWICK; JOHN FERGUSON; FIRENZE FAMILY TRUST; WILLIAM FRASER; JAY SHAM GABEHART; SHERRIE GEORGE; JEANINE HILLIARD GORECHAN; WINSTON HARRIS; FEI HAVENOR; SCOTT HAVENOR; JACQUELINE HAZEY; LIAN HE; DANIEL HEBERT; SHARAL HERBERT; GERALD HOLMES; AMY HUANG; JOHN C. JENKINS; YANBO JIANG; MARIE JOHNSON; CATHY KAISER; JAMES KARG; LEONARD KLEINPETER; JEANINE GORCHEN-KRASLEY; JAMES LAPPAS; VENETIA LAPPAS; KAREN LAWRENCE; TRISH LAVECK; RICHARD LESTER; ANG LI; HONGBIN LI; JIN LI; HAROLD LIKEY; FRANK LOPINTO; ARTHUR MARKS; PEGGY McCAULEY; JOHN McCORMICK; MITCH McDONALD; TERRY McKNIGHT; KEITH MORALES; JEFF MULLIS; HANH NGUYEN; DAN NOLAN; XAIO YUN PAN; DONNA PETERS; PIRRO PETI; SUSAN POLLINGER; MARK POULSEN; JILL ANN PURKEY; WENDY PYNE; MICAELA ROGERS; OLIVIA SAN MIGUEL; LUIS SAN MIGUEL; TERRI SALTZMAN; FRANK SCHENCK; JOHN BRADY SESSUMS; YILING SHI; JACKLINE SLEZAK; CARLISE STARGILL; JUDITH TALLETT; PATRICIA THAXTON; STEPHEN THAXTON; GREGORY TINDALL; ORVIS TULLY; BRAD VAN; DAWN VAUGHN; PEINA WANG; KAREN WARREN; DELDEIRDRA WEBB; BLAKE WELLERMAN; BRIAN WILSON; LORY WILLIAMS; HONG YU; YU ZHANG; BILL ZOELLIN, re: #11 Amended Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Robbin, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #10 Amended Complaint,,,, against Jeffrey Arnold, Katherine Arnold, Randall Bahjat, Jeff Browne, Kimberly Burks, Tom Chrisman, Gertrude Collins, Neal Collins, Traci Cougle, Diane Denton, Thomas Denton, Ernesto DiGiordano, Diversified Financing, LLC, John Does(s), Francis Early, David Ernest, David Evans, Debbie Evans, Evans Family Trust, David Farwick, John Ferguson, Ferrum II, LLC, Firenze Family Trust, William Fraser, Jay Sham Gabehart, Sherrie George, Jeanine Gorchen-Krasley, Jeanine Hilliard Gorechan, Winston Harris, Fei Havenor, Scott Havenor, Jacqueline Hazey, Lian He, Daniel Hebert, Sharal Herbert, Gerald Holmes, Amy Huang, IRA Services Trust Company, John C Jenkins, Yanbo Jiang, Marie Johnson, Cathy Kaiser, James Karg, Leonard Kleinpeter, James Lappas, Venetia Lappas, Trish Laveck, Karen Lawrence, Richard Lester, Ang Li, Hongbin Li, Jin Li, Harold Likey, Frank Lopinto, Arthur Marks, Peggy McCauley, John McCormick, Mitch McDonald, Terry McKnight, Keith Morales, Jeff Mullis, Hanh Nguyen, Dan Nolan, Xio Yun Pan, Donna Peters, Pirro Peti, Susan Pollinger, Mark Poulsen, Provident Trust Group, Jill Ann Purkey, Wendy Pyne, Micaela Rogers, Terri Saltzman, Luis San Miguel, Olivia San Miguel, Frank Schenck, John Brady Sessums, Yiling Shi, Jackline Slezak, Sonoqui, LLC, Carlise Stargill, Judith Tallett, Patricia Thaxton, Stephen Thaxton, Gregory Tindall, Orvis Tully, Brad Van, Vantage Retirement Plans, LLC, Dawn Vaughn, Peina Wang, Karen Warren, Deldeirdra Webb, Blake Wellerman, Lory Williams, Brian Wilson, Hong Yu, Yu Zhang, Bill Zoellin, Scott Farwick with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC. Related document: #10 Amended Complaint,,,,..(Robbin, Jonathan) Modified on 3/4/2020 (pc). [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 3, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jonathan M. Robbin to RE-FILE re: Document No. #10 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Scott Farwick must be added; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 3, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Amy Huang, John C Jenkins, Yanbo Jiang, Leonard Kleinpeter, Hongbin Li, Jin Li, Frank Lopinto, Keith Morales, Dan Nolan, Xaio Yun Pan, Jill Ann Purkey, Micaela Rogers, John Brady Sessums, Yiling Shi, Patricia Thaxton, Stephen Thaxton, Orvis Tully, Peina Wang, Deldeirdra Webb, Blake Wellerman, Hong Yu added. Party added pursuant to #10 Amended Complaint,,,,.Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC. Related document: #10 Amended Complaint,,,,..(Robbin, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 3, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Traci Cougle, Diane Denton, Thomas Denton, Francis Early, David Evans, David Farwick, John Ferguson, Firenze Family Trust, Jay Sham Gabehart, Jeanine Hilliard Gorechan, Wintson Harris, Scott Havenor, Jacqueline Hazey, Lian He, Daniel Hebert, Sharal Hebert added. Party added pursuant to #10 Amended Complaint,,,,.Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC. Related document: #10 Amended Complaint,,,,..(Robbin, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
March 2, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Kimberly Burks, Gertrude Collins added. Party added pursuant to #10 Amended Complaint,,,,.Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC. Related document: #10 Amended Complaint,,,,..(Robbin, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #7 Complaint against Jeffrey Arnold, Katherine Arnold, Randall Bahjat, Jeff Browne, Tom Chrisman, Neal Collins, Ernesto DiGiordano, Diversified Financing, LLC, John Does(s), David Ernest, Debbie Evans, Evans Family Trust, Ferrum II, LLC, William Fraser, Sherrie George, Jeanine Gorchen-Krasley, Fei Havenor, Gerald Holmes, IRA Services Trust Company, Marie Johnson, Cathy Kaiser, James Karg, James Lappas, Venetia Lappas, Trish Laveck, Karen Lawrence, Richard Lester, Ang Li, Harold Likey, Arthur Marks, Peggy McCauley, John McCormick, Mitch McDonald, Terry McKnight, Jeff Mullis, Hanh Nguyen, Donna Peters, Pirro Peti, Susan Pollinger, Mark Poulsen, Provident Trust Group, Wendy Pyne, Terri Saltzman, Luis San Miguel, Olivia San Miguel, Frank Schenck, Jackline Slezak, Sonoqui, LLC, Carlise Stargill, Judith Tallett, Gregory Tindall, Brad Van, Vantage Retirement Plans, LLC, Dawn Vaughn, Karen Warren, Lory Williams, Brian Wilson, Yu Zhang, Bill Zoellin.Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC. Related document: #7 Complaint..(Robbin, Jonathan) Modified on 3/3/2020 (sj). [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeffrey Arnold, Katherine Arnold, Randall Bahjat, Jeff Browne, Tom Chrisman, Neal Collins, Ernesto DiGiordano, Diversified Financing, LLC, David Ernest, Debbie Evans, Evans Family Trust, Ferrum II, LLC, William Fraser, Sherrie George, Jeanine Gorchen-Krasley, Fei Havenor, Gerald Holmes, IRA Services Trust Company, Marie Johnson, Cathy Kaiser, James Karg, James Lappas, Venetia Lappas, Trish Laveck, Karen Lawrence, Richard Lester, Ang Li, Harold Likey, Arthur Marks, Peggy McCauley, John McCormick, Mitch McDonald, Terry McKnight, Jeff Mullis, Hanh Nguyen, Donna Peters, Pirro Peti, Susan Pollinger, Mark Poulsen, Provident Trust Group, Wendy Pyne, Terri Saltzman, Luis San Miguel, Olivia San Miguel, Frank Schenck, Jackline Slezak, Sonoqui, LLC, Carlise Stargill, Judith Tallett, Gregory Tindall, Brad Van, Vantage Retirement Plans, LLC, Dawn Vaughn, Karen Warren, Lory Williams, Brian Wilson, Yu Zhang, Bill Zoellin..(sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
February 6, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jeffrey Arnold, Katherine Arnold, Randall Bahjat, Jeff Browne, Tom Chrisman, Neal Collins, Ernesto DiGiordano, Diversified Financing, LLC, John Does(s), David Ernest, Debbie Evans, Evans Family Trust, Ferrum II, LLC, William Fraser, Sherrie George, Jeanine Gorchen-Krasley, Fei Havenor, Gerald Holmes, IRA Services Trust Company, Marie Johnson, Cathy Kaiser, James Karg, James Lappas, Venetia Lappas, Trish Laveck, Karen Lawrence, Richard Lester, Ang Li, Harold Likey, Arthur Marks, Peggy McCauley, John McCormick, Mitch McDonald, Terry McKnight, Jeff Mullis, Hanh Nguyen, Donna Peters, Pirro Peti, Susan Pollinger, Mark Poulsen, Provident Trust Group, Wendy Pyne, Terri Saltzman, Luis San Miguel, Olivia San Miguel, Frank Schenck, Jackline Slezak, Sonoqui, LLC, Carlise Stargill, Judith Tallett, Gregory Tindall, Brad Van, Vantage Retirement Plans, LLC, Dawn Vaughn, Karen Warren, Lory Williams, Brian Wilson, Yu Zhang, Bill Zoellin, re: #7 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Robbin, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
February 6, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Jeffrey Arnold, Katherine Arnold, Randall Bahjat, Jeff Browne, Tom Chrisman, Neal Collins, Ernesto DiGiordano, Diversified Financing, LLC, John Does(s), David Ernest, Debbie Evans, Evans Family Trust, Ferrum II, LLC, William Fraser, Sherrie George, Jeanine Gorchen-Krasley, Fei Havenor, Gerald Holmes, IRA Services Trust Company, Marie Johnson, Cathy Kaiser, James Karg, James Lappas, Venetia Lappas, Trish Laveck, Karen Lawrence, Richard Lester, Ang Li, Harold Likey, Arthur Marks, Peggy McCauley, John McCormick, Mitch McDonald, Terry McKnight, Jeff Mullis, Hanh Nguyen, Donna Peters, Pirro Peti, Susan Pollinger, Mark Poulsen, Provident Trust Group, Wendy Pyne, Terri Saltzman, Luis San Miguel, Olivia San Miguel, Frank Schenck, Jackline Slezak, Sonoqui, LLC, Carlise Stargill, Judith Tallett, Gregory Tindall, Brad Van, Vantage Retirement Plans, LLC, Dawn Vaughn, Karen Warren, Lory Williams, Brian Wilson, Yu Zhang, Bill Zoellin. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Robbin, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
February 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jonathan M. Robbin to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the party names must be listed on the 'as to' docket entry text and must not include 'et al';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
February 6, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
February 6, 2020 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
February 6, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
February 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Jonathan M. Robbin. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: each individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. The party was added to the case in error. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
February 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jonathan M. Robbin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: all of the defendants. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
February 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jonathan M. Robbin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None); Class Action code n (No Class Action Alleged);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the Class Action code has been modified to y (Class Action Alleged);. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
February 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jonathan M. Robbin to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Robbin, Jonathan) Modified on 2/6/2020 (jgo). [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
February 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jonathan M. Robbin to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; party roles on the PDF case caption must be 'Interpleader Plaintiff(s) v. Interpleader Defendant(s); the All Parties radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 2/10/2020. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Diversified Financing, LLC, et al, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Robbin, Jonathan) Modified on 2/6/2020 (jgo). [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew T. Hambelton on behalf of Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Hambelton, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Robbin, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Robbin, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Parties. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18683816)Document filed by Collins Asset Group, LLC..(Robbin, Jonathan) Modified on 2/5/2020 (jgo). [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins Asset Group, LLC v. Diversified Financing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VENETIA LAPPAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEANINE GORCHEN-KRASLEY
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob McCauley
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yu Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLISE STARGILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES KARG
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PIRRO PETI
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLIVIA SAN MIGUEL
Represented By: Leonard Benowich
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAROLD LIKEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRAD VAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDALL BAHJAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY TINDALL
Represented By: Melinda Jane Steuer
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBBIE EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winston Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES LAPPAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Sham Gabehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lian He
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOM CHRISMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRA Services Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Kleinpeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evans Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Early
Represented By: Russell Donald King
Represented By: Collin Day Hatcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Arnold
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUIS SAN MIGUEL
Represented By: Leonard Benowich
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Financing, LLC
Represented By: John R Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jin Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAWN VAUGHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERRIE GEORGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WENDY PYNE
Represented By: Stephen J. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hongbin Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hong Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C Jenkins
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ernest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDITH TALLETT
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yanbo Jiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Johnson
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharal Herbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEI HAVENOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACKLINE SLEZAK
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRI SALTZMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Hazey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORY WILLIAMS
Represented By: Melinda Jane Steuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHERINE ARNOLD
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Thaxton
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Brady Sessums
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Lopinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Farwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARTHUR MARKS
Represented By: Michael A. Starvaggi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traci Cougle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRY McKNIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Fraser
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xio Yun Pan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRISH LAVECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Havenor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEGGY McCAULEY
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yiling Shi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vantage Retirement Plans, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonoqui, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Thaxton
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gertrude Collins
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MITCH McDONALD
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peina Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Pollinger
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferrum II, LLC
Represented By: Dayton Peter Haigney, III
Represented By: John W. Shanklin, II
Represented By: David Austin Bersinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK SCHENCK
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deldeirdra Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Ann Purkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHY KAISER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly burks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Holmes
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Farwick
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Trust Group
Represented By: Michael J. Slocum
Represented By: John R Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orvis Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFF BROWNE
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERNESTO DIGIORDANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Lawrence
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanine Hilliard Gorechan
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK POULSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILL ZOELLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Wellerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firenze Family Trust
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micaela Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McCormick
Represented By: Lavinia Andreea Acaru
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Represented By: Samuel Gaulden Alderman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFF MULLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Lester
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEAL COLLINS
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanh Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Nola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collins Asset Group, LLC
Represented By: Andrew T. Hambelton
Represented By: Jonathan M. Robbin
Represented By: Kurt G. Kastorf
Represented By: Gregory P. Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?