Abdulaziz v. Sentry Select Insurance et al
Plaintiff: Mohammed A. Abdulaziz
Defendant: White Oak Transportation, Inc., White Oak Logistics, Inc., Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Randall Pugh, Sentry Select Insurance, Milbank Insurance Company and State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02867
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Intradistrict Transfer to Rome Division, new case number 4:20-CV-200. (jpk) Modified on 9/2/2020 to edit text (jpk).
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the #15 and #21 Motions to the extent they seek transfer of this civil action to the Rome Division and ORDERS that this case be transferred to the Rome Division of this District. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 9/2/2020. (jpk)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 1, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 First MOTION to Transfer Case to Rome Division filed by Mohammed A. Abdulaziz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Police Report)(Ellis, Danny)
August 25, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Transfer Case to Rome Divison by Randall Pugh, Sentry Select Insurance, White Oak Logistics, Inc.. (Hardee, James)
August 25, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Randall Pugh, Sentry Select Insurance, White Oak Logistics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company for Randall Pugh, Sentry Select Insurance, White Oak Logistics, Inc. by Randall Pugh, Sentry Select Insurance, White Oak Logistics, Inc..(Hardee, James)
August 25, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Randall Pugh, Sentry Select Insurance, White Oak Logistics, Inc..(Hardee, James) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 24, 2020 Filing 18 First Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, White Oak Transportation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut. (Cox, Sean)
August 24, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by White Oak Transportation, Inc..(Cox, Sean) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 8/25/2020 to remove double wording (adg).
August 24, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut.(Cox, Sean) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 8/25/2020 to remove double wording (adg).
August 24, 2020 Filing 15 First MOTION to Transfer Case to Rome Division with Brief In Support by Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, White Oak Transportation, Inc.. (Cox, Sean)
August 20, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Milbank Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 1/19/2021.(Alfonso, Ashley) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 8/21/2020 to remove State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company as a filer (bnp).
August 13, 2020 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Mohammed A. Abdulaziz. White Oak Transportation, Inc. served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Ellis, Danny)
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Mohammed A. Abdulaziz. White Oak Logistics, Inc. served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Ellis, Danny)
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Mohammed A. Abdulaziz. Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020. (Ellis, Danny)
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Mohammed A. Abdulaziz. State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020. (Ellis, Danny)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Mohammed A. Abdulaziz. Sentry Select Insurance served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. (Ellis, Danny)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Mohammed A. Abdulaziz. Randall Pugh served on 8/4/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (Ellis, Danny)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Randall Pugh. (bnp)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Mohammed A. Abdulaziz for Randall Pugh (Ellis, Danny)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 7/13/2020. (bnp)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/10/2020.(ah)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Randall Pugh, Sentry Select Insurance, Travels Indemnity Company of Connecticut, White Oak Logistics, Inc. and White Oak Transportation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(ah)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Mohammed Abdulaziz. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9885841) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdulaziz v. Sentry Select Insurance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Oak Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Cox
Represented By: Mark Daniel Christopher
Represented By: Scott Harlan Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Oak Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Olson
Represented By: James William Hardee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Represented By: Sean Cox
Represented By: Mark Daniel Christopher
Represented By: Scott Harlan Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Pugh
Represented By: David A. Olson
Represented By: James William Hardee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentry Select Insurance
Represented By: David A. Olson
Represented By: James William Hardee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milbank Insurance Company
Represented By: Ashley Denise Alfonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed A. Abdulaziz
Represented By: Morgan G. Adams
Represented By: Danny Ray Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?