Somya Homes LLC v. Nedd
Plaintiff: Somya Homes LLC
Defendant: Veronica L. Nedd
Case Number: 1:2020cv02935
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Referring Judge: Russell G Vineyard
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re #9 Notice (Other), and certified copy re #8 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, to Magistrate Court of Gwinnett County, GA. (jta)
August 14, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Veronica L. Nedd, Somya Homes LLC re #8 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (jta)
August 14, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (jta)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Remand re #8 Order, to Magistrate Court of Gwinnett County, GA. (jta)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: after consideration of Defendant's Objections and a de novo review of the record, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's objections Doc. #7 are OVERRULED. The Court APPROVES AND ADOPTS the Final Report and Recommendation Doc. #4 as the opinion and order of the Court. The action is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Gwinnett County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/14/2020. (jta)
August 12, 2020 Submission of FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Notice of Removal, filed by Veronica L. Nedd, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (jta)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 OBJECTIONS to #4 Report and Recommendation filed by Veronica L. Nedd. (jta)
August 5, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Somya Homes LLC re #6 Order. (aaq)
August 5, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Veronica L. Nedd re #6 Order. (aaq)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
July 27, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Veronica L. Nedd re #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (jta)
July 27, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Somya Homes LLC re #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (jta)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 7/27/2020. (jta)
July 27, 2020 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING re #3 Notice of Removal, filed by Veronica L. Nedd be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Gwinnett County. (as found w/i #4 R&R). By Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 7/27/2020. (jta)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, defendant's #1 request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED, but it is RECOMMENDED that this case be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Gwinnett County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate this reference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 7/27/2020. (jta)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Veronica L. Nedd. (Attachments: #1 Ntc of Removal 2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jta) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 15, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Veronica L. Nedd, Somya Homes LLC re #2 Order. (bnp)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020. (bnp)
July 15, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (bnp)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Veronica L. Nedd. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Petition for Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Somya Homes LLC v. Nedd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica L. Nedd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Somya Homes LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?