Hopkins v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Hopkins
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2020cv02968
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting (589) Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Deposition of Oliver Martini and Production of Documents in case 1:17-md-02782-RWS. The parties are directed to meet and confer concerning the details since Plaintiffs' original requested deposition date is no longer feasible. The parties shall decide upon a mutually agreed date for Mr. Martini to be deposed as well as a timeline in advance of the deposition date to provide Plaintiffs with the document production at least 21 days before the scheduled deposition. (See Order for details) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 8/11/2020. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 22 - (Amended Discovery, Scheduling, and Case Management Order - Trial Cases) Selection of Trial Cases: James Bovian 1:17-cv-04840; Jim B. and Diane Crumbley 1:18-cv-00748; Danielle Guffey 1:18-cv-00402; Jeffrey Smith 1:17-cv-05031. Dispositive or Daubert motions shall be filed in the First Trial Case by July 31, 2020. Responses shall be filed by August 28, 2020. Replies shall be filed by September 7, 2020. By August 14, 2020, each party shall serve designations of deposition testimony proposed in the First Trial Case to be introduced into evidence at trial. Motions in Limine: First Trial Case shall be filed by September 21, 2020. Response briefs shall be filed by October 5, 2020. For any motions in limine filed prior to the deadline above, the response brief shall be filed within 21 days and any reply brief shall be filed within 7 days. Plaintiffs' seeking exclusion of FDA evidence, Defendants' response brief is due on August 3, 2020 and Plaintiffs' reply will be due by August 10, 2010. Exhibit and Witness List: October 13, 2020. Joint Pretrial Order: October 15, 2020. Final Pretrial Conference: October 22, 2010 at 10:00 am. Trial of the First Trial Case shall begin on November 2, 2020. The trial is expected to last two (2) to (3) weeks. Second Trial Selection: Defendants shall select the second case to be tried from the Trial Cases by October 12, 2020. Dispositive or Daubert motions shall be filed in the Second Trial Case by December 1, 2020. Responses shall be filed by December 14, 2020. Replies shall be filed by January 1, 2021. Trial of the Second Trial Case shall begin on February 22, 2021. The trial is expected to last two (2) to three (3) weeks. The third trial setting shall be a consolidated trial. The court will set a time for the parties to be heard on the makeup of the consolidation. The trial will begin on May 10, 2021. The trial is expected to last three (3) to four (4) weeks. All remaining deadlines for the third trial setting will be established by subsequent Order of the Court. (See order for details) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 7/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020. (bdb)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Barbara Hopkins. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9921452) DIRECT FILE MDL - Maryland, Northern. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopkins v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Hopkins
Represented By: William L Bross, IV
Represented By: Caroline Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?