Great American Insurance Company v. Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc.
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company
Defendant: Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02984
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, AG, Other Affiliate Allied World Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Allied World Assurance Holdings (U.S.) Inc., Other Affiliate Allied World Assurance Holdings (Ireland) Ltd., Other Affiliate Allied World Assurance Company, Ltd., Other Affiliate Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, Ltd. for Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc.. (Cameron, Deborah)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT , Affirmative Defenses and ( Discovery ends on 1/28/2021.), COUNTERCLAIM against Great American Insurance Company by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc..(Cameron, Deborah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John Lowell McKinley, Jr on behalf of Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc. (McKinley, John)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Shelles Cameron on behalf of Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc. (Cameron, Deborah)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc.. (Cameron, Deborah)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #5 Order, (Athans, Michael)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: Guidelines to Parties and Counsel in cases Proceeding before Judge Amy Totenberg. Parties are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 7/27/20. (jpa)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020. (ah)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Great American Insurance Company. (Athans, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc. (ah) Modified to edit text on 7/20/2020 (ah).
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment filed by Great American Insurance Company (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9926226). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great American Insurance Company v. Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael J. Athans
Represented By: Michael George Kouskoutis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc.
Represented By: John Lowell McKinley, Jr.
Represented By: Deborah Shelles Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?