Sadural v. Neutron Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Adrienne Sadural
Defendant: Neutron Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03001
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Proceedings MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay filed by Adrienne Sadural. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Enforce Arbitration and Stay Litigation)(Moriarty, Daniel)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Proceedings with Brief In Support by Neutron Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Bajurin))(Marcovitch, Robert) . Added MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay on 8/28/2020 (tcc).
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Neutron Holdings, Inc. Answer due 8/27/2020. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 8/6/2020. (tcc)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time File Response re: #1 Complaint, by Neutron Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiOrio, Michael) Modified on 8/5/2020 to include consent (bdb).
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Adrienne Sadural. Neutron Holdings, Inc. served on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. (Moriarty, Daniel)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED GENERAL ORDER In Re: Court Operations under the exigent Circumstances created by COVID-19 and related CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020. (kt) (kt)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Neutron Holdings, Inc. (kt)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Adrienne Sadural.(kt)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9932771) filed by Adrienne Sadural. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sadural v. Neutron Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrienne Sadural
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Moriarty
Represented By: Kevin P. Race
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neutron Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Peter Marcovitch
Represented By: Michael P. DiOrio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?