Barnes v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mechelle Barnes
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Trans Union, LLC and MoneyLion, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03013
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Referring Judge: Catherine M Salinas
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Trans Union, Corporate Parent Trans Union Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (Barfield, Alex)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #13 Trans Union, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Trans Union, LLC's Answer is now due on or before 9/23/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 09/11/2020. (drg)
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barfield, Alex)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Mechelle Barnes. Trans Union, LLC served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. (Landreau, Matthew)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Mechelle Barnes. (Landreau, Matthew)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #9 Equifax's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Equifax Information Services, LLC's Answer is now due on or before 10/13/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 09/10/2020. (drg)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stringer, Jordan)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mechelle Barnes by Mechelle Barnes.(Landreau, Matthew)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020. (adg)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to MoneyLion, Inc.. (adg)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Trans Union, LLC. (adg)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. (adg)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Mechelle Barnes. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9934996) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Jordan T. Stringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Alex Michael Barfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MoneyLion, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mechelle Barnes
Represented By: Matthew J Landreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?