Estrada v. Office Depot, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Estrada
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc. a Foreign Profit Corporation doing business as Office Depot
Case Number: 1:2020cv03036
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 20, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Office Depot, Inc. answer due 9/9/2020 per #10 Order. (jta)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, it is ORDERED that Defendant Office Depot, Inc. d/b/a Office Depot will have through, and including, September 9, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/20/2020. (jta)
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION (Joint Stipulation For Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint) by Office Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Gavin)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gavin Stone Appleby on behalf of Office Depot, Inc. (Appleby, Gavin)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Michael Estrada. Office Depot, Inc. served on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (Pope, Matthew)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
July 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 7/24/2020. (bgt)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/20. (tcc)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Michael Estrada. (tcc)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Office Depot, Inc.. (tcc)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michael Estrada. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9939530) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estrada v. Office Depot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Estrada
Represented By: Matthew N. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc. a Foreign Profit Corporation doing business as Office Depot
Represented By: Gavin Stone Appleby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?