Vu v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Long Duc Vu
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Chad F. Wolf, Gregory A. Richardson and William Barr
Case Number: 1:2020cv03086
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answer due 12/28/2020. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/17/20. (bnw)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Brief In Support by William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Gregory A. Richardson, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Treadwell, Trishanda)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Long Duc Vu. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proof of Service Executed)(Echols, Eli)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 7/31/20. (bnw)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/20. (eop)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Gregory A. Richardson. (eop)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli. (eop)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Chad F. Wolf. (eop)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to William Barr. (eop)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief filed by Long Duc Vu. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-9949127) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Plaintiff's Passport and Visa Page, #2 Exhibit -B -Approval Notice of Form I-140, #3 Exhibit -C - Receipt for Form I-485, #4 Exhibit -D -Approval Notice of Plaintiff's Work Cards, #5 Exhibit -E -July 2020 Visa Bulletin, #6 Exhibit -F - Processing Times, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vu v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Trishanda L. Treadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Trishanda L. Treadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory A. Richardson
Represented By: Trishanda L. Treadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Trishanda L. Treadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Long Duc Vu
Represented By: Eli A Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?