Byrd v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Byrd
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv03090
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #15 Application for Admission of Steven Haspel Pro Hac Vice. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/14/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnp)
September 10, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven Haspel Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Steven Haspel added appearing on behalf of Lorenzo Byrd (nmb)
September 9, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven Haspel Pro Hac Vice.by Lorenzo Byrd. (Tyrone, Nelson) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 9, 2020 RETURN of #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Tom Jacob Pro Hac Vice. to attorney for correction re: Duplicate Application. (cdg)
September 8, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Tom Jacob Pro Hac Vice.by Lorenzo Byrd. (Tyrone, Nelson) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 3, 2020 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Lorenzo Byrd. United States of America served on 8/3/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Tyrone, Nelson)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tom Jacob. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/2/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnp)
September 1, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Tom Jacob Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Tom Jacob added appearing on behalf of Lorenzo Byrd (cdg)
August 28, 2020 RETURN of #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven Haspel Pro Hac Vice. to attorney for correction re: Form is incorrect. (cdg)
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Tom Jacob Pro Hac Vice.by Lorenzo Byrd. (Tyrone, Nelson) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven Haspel Pro Hac Vice.by Lorenzo Byrd. (Tyrone, Nelson) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. Modified on 8/28/2020 QC email sent re wrong PDF(tmf).
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Lorenzo Byrd. United States of America served on 8/6/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Tyrone, Nelson)
August 6, 2020 RETURN of #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven Haspel Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9992238). to attorney for correction re: Local counsel's address. (cdg)
August 6, 2020 RETURN of #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Tom Jacob Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9992236). to attorney for correction re: Local Counsel's address. (cdg)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven Haspel Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9992238).by Lorenzo Byrd. (Tyrone, Nelson) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Tom Jacob Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9992236).by Lorenzo Byrd. (Tyrone, Nelson) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/28/2020. (tmf)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/20. (eop)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to U. S. Attorney Office -NDGA. (eop)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Attorney General (nited States of America). (eop)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Lorenzo Byrd. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9950059) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrd v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Byrd
Represented By: Nelson Otis Tyrone, III
Represented By: Jamal K. Alsaffar
Represented By: Steven Haspel
Represented By: Tom Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?