Ven Air Unlimited Company v. General Dynamics Corporation
Plaintiff: Ven Air Unlimited Company
Defendant: General Dynamics Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv03091
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (lwb)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/28/20. (bjh)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss And/Or Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration with Brief In Support by General Dynamics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Demand for Arbitration, #2 Exhibit B - Response to Demand for Arbitration, #3 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support)(Kachmar, Shawn) . Added MOTION to Stay on 7/29/2020 (bjh).
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by General Dynamics Corporation. (Kachmar, Shawn)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Fifth Amendment to General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020. (jpk)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by General Dynamics Corporation (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9950173). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Ven Air Arbitration Demand, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jpk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ven Air Unlimited Company v. General Dynamics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ven Air Unlimited Company
Represented By: Dana M. Richens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Corporation
Represented By: Michael A. Doornweerd
Represented By: Shawn A. Kachmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?