Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC
Defendant: Catherine C. Brooks, The Internal Revenue Service, United States of America and Pamela V. Stafford
Case Number: 1:2020cv03096
Filed: July 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC. The Internal Revenue Service waiver mailed on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020; United States of America waiver mailed on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Little, Samuel)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/20/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
August 20, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew Timothy Journy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10027868).. Attorney Matthew T. Journy added appearing on behalf of Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC (nmb)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew Timothy Journy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10027868).by Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC. (Little, Samuel) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/3/2020. (bnp)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/20. (eop)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to United States of America. (eop)
July 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9952533) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 7/28/2020 to correct date filed (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC
Represented By: Samuel Fenn Little, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew T. Journy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine C. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela V. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?