Bishop v. LG Chem America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Peter S. Bishop
Defendant: LG Chem America, Inc. and LG Chem, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03253
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Irvin, James)
September 30, 2020 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Bird, Melissa)
September 30, 2020 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Hedley, Rachel)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 28, 2020 Submission of #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (bdb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY BRIEF re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by LG Chem America, Inc.. (North, Richard)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AGREED ORDER granting #25 JOINT Motion for Extension of Time to postpone early case deadlines until after ruling on pending #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. The Parties' Initial Disclosures and the Parties' submission of a Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan are extended until fourteen (14) days after the Court has issued a ruling on LGCAI's pending Motion to Dismiss, if LGCAI has not been dismissed. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/24/2020. (bdb)
September 23, 2020 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to postpone early case deadlines until after ruling on pending Motion to Dismiss with Brief In Support by LG Chem America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Joint Motion to Extend Early Case Deadlines, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(North, Richard)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Melissa Foster Bird as to LG Chem America, Inc. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/22/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bdb)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice James T. Irvin, III as to LG Chem America, Inc. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/22/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bdb)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Rachel Atkin Hedley as to LG Chem America, Inc. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/22/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bdb)
September 21, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #21 APPLICATION for Admission of Melissa Foster Bird Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10160551).. Attorney Melissa Foster Bird added appearing on behalf of LG Chem America, Inc. (nmb)
September 21, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #20 APPLICATION for Admission of James T. Irvin, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10160497).. Attorney James T. Irvin, III added appearing on behalf of LG Chem America, Inc. (nmb)
September 21, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #19 APPLICATION for Admission of Rachel Atkin Hedley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10160414).. Attorney Rachel Atkin Hedley added appearing on behalf of LG Chem America, Inc. (nmb)
September 18, 2020 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Admission of Melissa Foster Bird Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10160551).by LG Chem America, Inc.. (North, Richard) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 18, 2020 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Admission of James T. Irvin, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10160497).by LG Chem America, Inc.. (North, Richard) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 18, 2020 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Admission of Rachel Atkin Hedley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10160414).by LG Chem America, Inc.. (North, Richard) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 14, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT filed by Peter S. Bishop. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Petition and Fourth Amended Petition in Missouri State Court, #2 Exhibit B - LG Chem's Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Opposition in Missouri State Court, #3 Exhibit C - Order of the Supreme Court of Missouri, #4 Exhibit D - Voluntary Dismissal of LG Chem in Missouri State Court)(Simon, John)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 1, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Compliance John M Simon (Sleppy, David)
September 1, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Compliance John G Simon (Sleppy, David)
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by LG Chem America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LG Chem Michigan, Inc. for LG Chem America, Inc.. (North, Richard)
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by LG Chem America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of LGCAI's Motion to Dismiss)(North, Richard)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice John M Simon as to Peter S. Bishop. (Sleppy, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 8/13/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bdb)
August 13, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Peter S. Bishop re #11 Order on Application for Admission PHV, to John G. Simon. (bdb)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice John G Simon as to Peter S. Bishop. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 8/13/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bdb)
August 12, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of John M Simon Pro Hac Vice. Attorney John M. Simon added appearing on behalf of Peter S. Bishop (cdg)
August 12, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of John G Simon Pro Hac Vice. Attorney John G. Simon added appearing on behalf of Peter S. Bishop (cdg)
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Peter S. Bishop. LG Chem America, Inc. served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Sleppy, David)
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of John M Simon Pro Hac Vice.by Peter S. Bishop. (Sleppy, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of John G Simon Pro Hac Vice.by Peter S. Bishop. (Sleppy, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 10, 2020 RETURN of #6 APPLICATION for Admission of John M. Simon Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10003828). to attorney for correction re: Local counsel's signature. (cdg)
August 10, 2020 RETURN of #5 APPLICATION for Admission of John G. Simon Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10003707). to attorney for correction re: Duplicate refiled with correct middle initial. (cdg)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on August 10, 2020. (ash)
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of John M. Simon Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10003828).by Peter S. Bishop. (Sleppy, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of John G. Simon Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10003707).by Peter S. Bishop. (Sleppy, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to LG Chem America, Inc.. (eop)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to LG Chem, Ltd.. (eop)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Peter S. Bishop. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9995144) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bishop v. LG Chem America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter S. Bishop
Represented By: John G. Simon
Represented By: John M. Simon
Represented By: David A. Sleppy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem America, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Represented By: Rachel Atkin Hedley
Represented By: James T. Irvin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?