Trujillo v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Hector Jaramillo Trujillo
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Denize Frazier, Chad Wolf and Director Shineka Scott Miller
Case Number: 1:2020cv03268
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to Shineka Scott Miller. (ah)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons filed by Hector Jaramillo Trujillo. (Attachments: #1 Summons Miller)(De Gaeta, Zachary-Jon) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified to correct event on 8/28/2020 (ah).
August 26, 2020 Proposed summons filed as attachment to #7 Amended Complaint will not be issued - attorney notified. (ah)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT For Mandamus and Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants filed by Hector Jaramillo Trujillo. (Attachments: #1 Summons Miller)(De Gaeta, Zachary-Jon) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to the U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General, Joseph Hunt, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Denize Frazier, Chad Wolf and Christopher A. Wray. (Attachments: #1 Summons Pak, #2 Summons Wray, #3 Summons Hunt, #4 Summons Cuccinelli, #5 Summons Frazier, #6 Summons Barr)(ah)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Hector Jaramillo Trujillo (Attachments: #1 Summons Pak, #2 Summons Wray, #3 Summons Hunt, #4 Summons Cuccinelli, #5 Summons Frazier, #6 Summons Barr)(De Gaeta, Zachary-Jon)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 8/13/2020. (ah)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Sixth Amendment to General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/2020. (jpk)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by Hector Jaramillo Trujillo. (jpk)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief filed by Hector Jaramillo Trujillo. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9999971) (Attachments: #1 Attachments in Support of Complaint for Mandamus, #2 Proposed Summons - Not Issued, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jpk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trujillo v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denize Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Shineka Scott Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Jaramillo Trujillo
Represented By: Zachary-Jon Fernandez De Gaeta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?