Milan v. LG Chem America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Milan
Defendant: LG Chem America, Inc. and LG Chem, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03286
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Submission of #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (bdb)
October 1, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY BRIEF re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by LG Chem America, Inc.. (North, Richard)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AGREED ORDER granting #25 Joint Motion to Extend Early Case Deadlines re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. The Parties' Initial Disclosures and the Parties' submission of a Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan are extended until fourteen (14) days after the Court has issued a ruling on LGCAI's pending Motion to Dismiss, if LGCAI has not been dismissed. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/24/2020. (bdb)
September 23, 2020 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to postpone early case deadlines until after ruling on pending Motion to Dismiss with Brief In Support by LG Chem America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(North, Richard)
September 22, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #24 APPLICATION for Admission of Melissa Foster Bird Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10160573).. Attorney Melissa Foster Bird added appearing on behalf of LG Chem America, Inc. (nmb)
September 22, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #23 APPLICATION for Admission of James T. Irvin, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10160524).. Attorney James T. Irvin, III added appearing on behalf of LG Chem America, Inc. (nmb)
September 22, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #22 APPLICATION for Admission of Rachel Atkin Hedley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10160471).. Attorney Rachel Atkin Hedley added appearing on behalf of LG Chem America, Inc. (nmb)
September 18, 2020 Filing 24 APPLICATION for Admission of Melissa Foster Bird Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10160573).by LG Chem America, Inc.. (North, Richard) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 18, 2020 Filing 23 APPLICATION for Admission of James T. Irvin, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10160524).by LG Chem America, Inc.. (North, Richard) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 18, 2020 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Admission of Rachel Atkin Hedley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10160471).by LG Chem America, Inc.. (North, Richard) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 17, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Christopher Milan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Petition in Missouri State Court, #2 Exhibit B - LG Chem's Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Opposition in Missouri State Court, #3 Exhibit C - Order of the Supreme Court of Missouri, #4 Exhibit D - Voluntary Dismissal of LG Chem in Missouri State Court)(Simon, John)
September 4, 2020 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by LG Chem America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LG Chem Michigan, Inc. for LG Chem America, Inc.. (North, Richard)
September 4, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by LG Chem America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of LG Chem America, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss)(North, Richard)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 1, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Compliance John M Simon (Sleppy, David)
September 1, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Compliance John G Simon (Sleppy, David)
September 1, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Compliance James W Eason (Sleppy, David)
August 31, 2020 Filing 17 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to James W. Eason re #13 Order on Application for Admission PHV, (tmf)
August 27, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Christopher Milan re #13 Order on Application for Admission PHV to James W. Eason. (bdb)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice James W. Eason for Christopher Milan. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 8/27/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bdb)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice John M Simon for Christopher Milan. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 8/27/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bdb)
August 27, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Christopher Milan re #11 Order on Application for Admission PHV: to John G. Simon. (bdb)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice John G. Simon for Christopher Milan. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 8/27/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bdb)
August 26, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of James W. Eason Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney James W. Eason added appearing on behalf of Christopher Milan (cdg)
August 26, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of John M Simon Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10060965).. Attorney John M. Simon added appearing on behalf of Christopher Milan (cdg)
August 26, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of John G Simon Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10060930).. Attorney John G. Simon added appearing on behalf of Christopher Milan (cdg)
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of James W. Eason Pro Hac Vice.by Christopher Milan. (Sleppy, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 26, 2020 RETURN of #6 APPLICATION for Admission of James W Eason Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10060881). to attorney for correction. (cdg)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Christopher Milan. LG Chem America, Inc. served on 8/14/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (Sleppy, David)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of John M Simon Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10060965).by Christopher Milan. (Sleppy, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of John G Simon Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10060930).by Christopher Milan. (Sleppy, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of James W Eason Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10060881).by Christopher Milan. (Sleppy, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on August 11, 2020. (ash)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to LG Chem, Ltd.. (eop)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to LG Chem America, Inc.. (eop)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Christopher Milan. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10005725) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milan v. LG Chem America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem America, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: James T. Irvin, III
Represented By: Rachel Atkin Hedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Milan
Represented By: John G. Simon
Represented By: John M. Simon
Represented By: David A. Sleppy
Represented By: James W. Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?