Harrell et al v. Bank of America N.A.
Plaintiff: Floyd Harrell and Dianne A. Harrell
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03303
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: Russell G Vineyard
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Dianne A. Harrell, Floyd Harrell re #9 Notice (Other). (dob)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 18, 2020 Submission of #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (dob)
September 14, 2020 Submission of #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (dob)
September 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Dianne A. Harrell, Floyd Harrell re #8 Notice (Other). (dob)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Dianne A. Harrell, Floyd Harrell. (dob)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Bank of America N.A.. (Mendel, Jarrod)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Dianne A. Harrell, Floyd Harrell. (dob)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Dianne A. Harrell, Floyd Harrell. (dob)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Bank of America N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A - Final Order in Harrell #3)(Mendel, Jarrod)
August 11, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Dianne A. Harrell and Floyd Harrell re #2 Order. (eop)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 10, 2020 Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard added. (eop)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Bank of America N.A.. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-10012370) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrell et al v. Bank of America N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne A. Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Jarrod Sean Mendel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?