Amerson v. Deberry et al
Plaintiff: Christopher L. Amerson
Defendant: Clerk of Court, Clerk Debra Deberry, Clerk J. Sibley and Asha Jackson
Case Number: 1:2020cv03326
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Submission of #10 MOTION for Order, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (rvb)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Debra Deberry, J. Sibley, Asha Jackson filed by Christopher L. Amerson.(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 30, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Christopher L. Amerson re #11 Order. (rvb)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Order by Christopher L. Amerson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(rlb)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Christopher L. Amerson. (rlb)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #2 and #6 Affidavits and Authorizations for withdrawal from Inmate Account filed by Christopher L. Amerson, allowing Plaintiff to proceed IFP, however, Plaintiff is obligated to pay $350.00 as funds are deposited into Inmate account. The Warden or the designee shall collect the monthly payments and remit to Clerk until $350.00 is paid in full. MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint [Doc. 5] filed by Christopher L. Amerson is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, should Plaintiff decide to pursue any such claim(s), he must, within thirty (30) days of the date this Order is entered file an amended complaint using the form that the Clerk of Court will send him. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to forward the proper forms for filing a 42 U.S.C. 1983 action to Plaintiff together with a copy of this Order. Forms sent to party: 42:1983 Forms. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 9/11/2020. (kt) c:Financial Office(kt)
September 11, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Christopher L. Amerson and Warden re #8 Order ruling on IFP, Order Directing Warden to Collect Monthly Payments from Inmate Account Forms Sent 1983 form, instructions. (kt) Modified on 9/11/2020 (kt).
September 11, 2020 Notification of Docket Correction re Clerks Certificate of Mailing. Edited to add Warden. (kt)
September 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Christopher L. Amerson re: #7 Notice (Other). (pjm)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Christopher L. Amerson. (tmf)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaintby Christopher L. Amerson. (tmf)
August 20, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Christopher L. Amerson and Warden Macon State Prison re #4 Order, and 2 prisoner IFP forms. (tmf)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Macon State Prison is DIRECTED to submit the completed certificate signed by an authorized institutional officer regarding the current balance in Plaintiff's account and a certified copy of Plaintiff's inmate trust account balance within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to forward the appropriate financial affidavit to both Plaintiff and the Warden of the Macon State Prison together with a copy of this Order. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to resubmit this action to the undersigned Magistrate Judge upon the expiration of the aforementioned time period. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 8/19/2020(tmf)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 13, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Christopher L. Amerson re #3 Order. (eop)
August 13, 2020 Submission of #2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (eop)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Christopher L. Amerson. (No Authorization Signature) (eop)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Christopher L. Amerson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Show Cause Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit -Letter)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amerson v. Deberry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk of Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk Debra Deberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk J. Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asha Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher L. Amerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?