Fust et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Carol Fust and Dieter Fust
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, John Doe Corporations NO.s 1-10, Cyprus Mines Corporation and PTI Royston, LLC a Georgia Limited Liability Company doing business as Pharma Tech Industries
Case Number: 1:2020cv03387
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 New Civil Action Number in USDC NJ 3:20-cv-12394 (aar)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 2, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (jta)
September 2, 2020 Case transferred electronically to USDC District of New Jersey for inclusion in MDL 2738. (jta)
September 2, 2020 Filing 16 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-225 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring action to the USDC New Jersey for inclusion in MDL 2738. (jta)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Having considered the Plaintiff's and Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Joint Motion to Extend Mandatory Filings Doc. #14 , and for good cause shown, The Motion is GRANTED. The filing deadlines imposed by Local Rules 16.1, 16.2, and 26.1 are deferred and will not run until this Court rules on Plaintiff's anticipated Motion to Remand. Notwithstanding the foregoing, the parties will file their Certificate of Interested Persons in accordance with Local Rule 3.3 no later than September 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/31/2020. (jta)
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time File Mandatory Filings by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Gieser, Caroline)
August 25, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Related Action by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of related action, #2 letter)(jta)
August 21, 2020 Clerks Notation re #11 Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by MHC. (lwb)
August 21, 2020 Clerks Notation re #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement, and #9 Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by MHC. (lwb)
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by PTI Royston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant PTI Royston LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(Marshall, David) Modified on 8/21/2020 to edi text(jta).
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PTI Royston, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Broadview Investments, LLC for PTI Royston, LLC .(Marshall, David) Modified on 8/21/2020 to edit text to reflect correct CP(jta).
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by PTI Royston, LLC.(Marshall, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 8/21/2020 to remove double wording (jta).
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company identifying Corporate Parent Freeport-McMoRan, Inc., Corporate Parent Freeport Minerals Corporation for Cyprus Amax Minerals Company by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company.(Shultz, Chad)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand -ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company.(Shultz, Chad) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/19/2020. (jta)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/20.(aaq)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson. (aaq)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Johnson & Johnson.(aaq)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by Johnson & Johnson, and Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(aaq)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint within the #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson, and Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. Discovery ends on 1/11/2021.(aaq) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC - 10030775) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court File, #3 Exhibit 3 - CAMC Consent to Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaq) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fust et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Gieser
Represented By: Colin Kamrath Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company
Represented By: Ann Thornton Field
Represented By: Chad Allan Shultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Gieser
Represented By: Colin Kamrath Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Caroline Gieser
Represented By: Colin Kamrath Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations NO.s 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Mines Corporation
Represented By: Ann Thornton Field
Represented By: Chad Allan Shultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTI Royston, LLC a Georgia Limited Liability Company doing business as Pharma Tech Industries
Represented By: David C. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Fust
Represented By: Robert David Cheeley
Represented By: Julia Ann Merritt
Represented By: Roy E. Barnes
Represented By: John Raymond Bevis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dieter Fust
Represented By: Robert David Cheeley
Represented By: Julia Ann Merritt
Represented By: Roy E. Barnes
Represented By: John Raymond Bevis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?