Sterigenics U.S., LLC v. Phelps et al
Plaintiff: Sterigenics U.S., LLC
Defendant: Roger Phelps, Thea Powell, John Demarest, Daniel Post and Carolyn Turner
Case Number: 1:2020cv03388
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE by Sterigenics U.S., LLC of Filing of Evidence in Support of Its Standing to Bring this Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Law360 Article)(Warren, Sara)
September 30, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE by Sterigenics U.S., LLC Concerning Filing of Lawsuit Alleging Property Devaluation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint filed Sept. 29, 2020)(Warren, Sara)
September 29, 2020 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William M. Ray, II: The Court held a remote hearing on the subject matter jurisdiction issues. The Court will allow through October 21, 2020 for the parties to each file briefs and authorities on the issue of the Court's discretion as it relates to entertaining a declaratory judgment as Plaintiff requests. In the interim, the Court reserve ruling on the issue of standing and ORDERS litigation, discovery and answer deadlines be STAYED until a decision is reached on the standing Plaintiff has to bring the complaint as well as whether the Court should entertain its discretion. If events do transpire as Plaintiff believes and there is a lawsuit filed about devaluation of property, Plaintiff is directed to notify the Court and Defendants by filing a notice on the docket. That may or may not figure into the Court's decision as to if this lawsuit can and should proceed. (Court Reporter Wynette Blathers)(ah)
September 29, 2020 NOTICE of TIME CHANGE: Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge William M. Ray II. (jkl)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 24, 2020 Zoom instructions: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1611058489 Meeting ID: 161 105 8489 Passcode: 1705 Phone audio option, dial: +1 646 828 7666. (jkl)
September 15, 2020 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Order Determining the Court Has Subject Matter Jurisdiction in this Matter re: #7 Order,. (Warren, Sara)
September 15, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #7 Order, filed by Sterigenics U.S., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Warren, Sara)
September 15, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Order Dismissing Case For Lack of Standing re: #7 Order,. (Bachman, Charles)
September 15, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #7 Order, filed by John Demarest, Roger Phelps, Daniel Post, Thea Powell, Carolyn Turner. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Steven White)(Bachman, Charles)
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE RESCHEDULING HEARING: Notice is hereby given that the Court reschedules a hearing to be conducted via ZOOM VIDEO on the jurisdictional issues in this case for Tuesday, September 29, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. before the Honorable William M. Ray, II. The hearing will NOT be a live hearing in the courtroom. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 9/11/2020. (ah)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING: Notice is hereby given that the Court sets a hearing to be conducted via ZOOM VIDEO on the jurisdictional issues in this case for Monday, September 28, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. before the Honorable William M. Ray, II. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 9/9/2020. (ah)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until fourteen (14) days after the Court issues an Order on the matter of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 9/9/2020. (ah)
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by John Demarest, Roger Phelps, Daniel Post, Thea Powell, Carolyn Turner. (Farist, Thomas)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles L. Bachman, Jr on behalf of John Demarest, Roger Phelps, Daniel Post, Thea Powell, Carolyn Turner (Bachman, Charles)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Owen Farist on behalf of John Demarest, Roger Phelps, Daniel Post, Thea Powell, Carolyn Turner (Farist, Thomas)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff and Defendants are directed to file briefs with the Court within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. Given that Defendants all have similar interests, the Court is only looking for one (1) brief and order on behalf of all of the Defendants. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 8/25/2020. (ah)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Sterigenics U.S., LLC. All Defendants. (Grantham, Thomas)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 8/24/2020. (ah)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020.(ah)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to John Demarest, Roger Phelps, Daniel Post, Thea Powell and Carolyn Turner. (Attachments: #1 Summons Post, #2 Summons Powell, #3 Summons Turner, #4 Summons Demarest)(ah)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sterigenics U.S., LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sotera Health LLC, Other Affiliates Sotera Health Holdings, LLC, Sotera Health Topco, Inc., and Health Topco Parent, L.P. for Sterigenics U.S., LLC. (ah)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sterigenics U.S., LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10031175). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sterigenics U.S., LLC v. Phelps et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Phelps
Represented By: Charles L. Bachman, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Owen Farist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thea Powell
Represented By: Charles L. Bachman, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Owen Farist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Demarest
Represented By: Charles L. Bachman, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Owen Farist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Post
Represented By: Charles L. Bachman, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Owen Farist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Turner
Represented By: Charles L. Bachman, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Owen Farist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sterigenics U.S., LLC
Represented By: Thomas Powell Grantham
Represented By: William Clay Massey
Represented By: Daniel Francis Diffley
Represented By: Sara Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?