Idahor v. Arbor East Cobb, LLC
Plaintiff: Osagioduwa Idahor
Defendant: Arbor East Cobb, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv03401
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Defendant by Osagioduwa Idahor.(Roberts, Victor)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 21, 2020 Clerks Notation re #9 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Read and approved by LMM. (bnp)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arbor East Cobb, LLC by Arbor East Cobb, LLC.(Bennett, John)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Arbor East Cobb, LLC. Discovery ends on 2/16/2021.(Bennett, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 3, 2020 Clerks Notation re #7 Certificate of Interested Persons. Read and approved by LMM. (bnp)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons by Osagioduwa Idahor. (Roberts, Victor)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Osagioduwa Idahor. Arbor East Cobb, LLC served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Roberts, Victor)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Arbor East Cobb, LLC. (tmf)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Osagioduwa Idahor (Roberts, Victor)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/2020. (rjs)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10034007) filed by Osagioduwa Idahor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Idahor v. Arbor East Cobb, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osagioduwa Idahor
Represented By: Victor Severin Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arbor East Cobb, LLC
Represented By: Travis Martin Cashbaugh
Represented By: John Douglas Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?