UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. v. Foam Depot, Inc.
Plaintiff: UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Foam Depot, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03408
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Foam Depot, Inc. Answer due 10/26/2020. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/9/20. (bnw)
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Foam Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memo in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order)(Dinardo, Joseph)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.. Foam Depot, Inc. served on 9/21/2020. (Toman, Gary)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (DUPLICATE FILING) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/21/20. (bnw) Modified on 8/21/2020 to edit text. Clerk's error (bnw).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/21/20. (bnw)
August 21, 2020 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons APPROVED by JPB. (bnw)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Foam Depot, Inc. (ddm)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Parcel Service, Inc. for UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.. (Toman, Gary)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. (Toman, Gary)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/2020. (bdb)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10036063) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. v. Foam Depot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foam Depot, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph J. Dinardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan R. Friedman
Represented By: Gary James Toman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?