Brown v. County of Fulton et al
Plaintiff: Paul Brown
Defendant: Brandon Lewis, Fulton County Board of Commissioners, Officer Gentle, John Doe #1, County of Fulton and Atlanta Police Dept.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03412
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR (duplicate filing) OBJECTIONS to #5 Report and Recommendation filed by Paul Brown. (rjs) Modified on 10/2/2020 to edit text (jpk).
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 OBJECTIONS to #5 Report and Recommendation filed by Paul Brown. (rlb)
September 30, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Paul Brown re #8 Order. (rvb)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 28, 2020 Submission of #5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpk)
September 11, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Paul Brown as to Paul Brown regarding #7 Order. (mlb)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis. Leave for Plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is GRANTED for the purpose of dismissal only. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 9/9/2020 within the #5 R&R. (jpk)
September 9, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Paul Brown re #5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #6 Order. (jpk)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Service of #5 Final Report and Recommendation. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 9/9/2020. (jpk)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ENTERED IN ERROR ORDER: Leave for Plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is GRANTED for the purpose of dismissal only. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 9/9/2020 within the #5 R&R. (jpk) Modified on 9/16/2020 to edit text (jpk).
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on the #1 Complaint. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the instant complaint be DISMISSED AS FRIVOLOUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned magistrate judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 9/9/2020. (jpk)
September 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Paul Brown re #4 Notice (Other). (jpa)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 19, 2020 Submission of #2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (eop)
August 19, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Paul Brown re #3 Order. (eop)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Paul Brown. (eop)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Paul Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. County of Fulton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulton County Board of Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Gentle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlanta Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?