Bowens v. Sealock
Plaintiff: Michael Bernard Bowens
Defendant: Maranda Sealock
Case Number: 1:2020cv03413
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Regina D Cannon
Referring Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Bernard Bowens re #7 Notice (Other). (rlb)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 24, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Bernard Bowens re #6 Order, USM 285, summons. (tmf)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A, this action is ALLOWED to proceed on Plaintiff's malicious prosecution claim against Maranda Sealock. The Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a USM 285 form and summons for Defendant, Maranda Sealock. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to complete a USM 285 form and summons for Defendant. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to return the completed material to the Clerk of Court within twenty (20) days from the entry date of this Order. Plaintiff is warned that failure to comply in a timely manner could result in the dismissal of his civil action. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this action to the undersigned if Plaintiff fails to comply. Upon receipt of the forms by the Clerk, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare a service waiver package for Defendant. On completion of the service waiver package, the Clerk is DIRECTED to complete the lower portion of the Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver form and to mail the service waiver package to Defendant. In the event Defendant does not return an executed Waiver of Service form to the Clerk of Court within thirty-five (35) days following the date the service waiver package was mailed, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare and transmit to the U.S. Marshals Service a service package for Defendant. The service package must include the USM 285 form, the summons, and one (1) copy of the complaint. Upon receipt of a service package for Defendant, the U.S. Marshals Service is DIRECTED to serve Defendant personally. The executed waiver form or the completed USM 285 form shall be filed with the Clerk. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to serve upon Defendant or his counsel a copy of every additional pleading or other document which is filed with the Clerk of the Court. Plaintiff is also REQUIRED to KEEP the Court and Defendant advised of his current address at all times during the pendency of this action. Plaintiff is admonished that the failure to do so may result in the dismissal of his action. The parties are INSTRUCTED that Prisoner civil rights cases are automatically assigned to a zero-month discovery track. If either party determines that discovery is required, that party should, within thirty days after Defendant's appearance by answer, file a motion requesting a discovery period. See order for further specifics. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 9/24/2020. (tmf)
September 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Bernard Bowens RE: #5 Order. (aaq)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 28, 2020 Submission of #1 Complaint for Frivolity review to Magistrate Judge Regina D. Cannon. (jpk)
August 28, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Warden and Michael Bernard Bowens re #4 Order. (jpk)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's #2 request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED, and Plaintiff shall be allowed to proceed without paying an initial partial filing fee. Pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), Plaintiff shall be obligated to pay the full statutory filing fee of $350.00 as funds are deposited in his inmate account. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: 1. The Clerk of the Court transmit a copy of this Order to the warden of the institution where Plaintiff is incarcerated; 2. The warden of the institution, or his designee, shall collect the aforesaid monthly payments from Plaintiff's inmate account and remit such payments to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; and 3. Service of process shall not issue until further consideration of the complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D. Cannon on 8/27/2020. (jpk)
August 19, 2020 Submission of #2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (eop)
August 19, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Bernard Bowens re #3 Order. (eop)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Maranda Sealock. (eop)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michael Bernard Bowens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit -Letter)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowens v. Sealock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bernard Bowens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maranda Sealock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?