McClenny v. Conway et al
Plaintiff: Ronald E. McClenny, Jr.
Defendant: R. L. (Butch) Conway, Karen Harris and Dr. Hashmi
Case Number: 1:2020cv03414
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing Fee Paid: $ 19.35, receipt number GAN100124719 (jpa)
October 8, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ronald E. McClenny, Jr. re #9 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #8 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (jpa)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Service of #8 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 10/8/20. (jpa)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint RECOMMENDING that this action be DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 10/8/20. (jpa)
September 30, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ronald E. McClenny, Jr. re #7 Notice (Other). (jpa)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 9, 2020 Partial Filing Fee Paid: $ 33.50, receipt number GAN100123958. (dob) Modified on 9/10/2020 to edit date (dob).
September 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ronald E. McClenny, Jr., re: #6 Notice (Other). (kac)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 Certified Mail Returned Receipt as to warden re #4 Order. (dob)
August 26, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Warden re #4 Order ruling on IFP. USPS 70200090000125288440. (dob)
August 26, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ronald E. McClenny, Jr. re #4 Order ruling on IFP. (dob)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff is ORDERED to pay an initial partial filing fee of $33.50 within 30 days from the date of this Order, however, Plaintiff is obligated to pay $350.00 as funds are deposited into Inmate account. The Warden or the designee shall collect the monthly payments and remit to Clerk until $350.00 is paid in full. Service of process shall not issue pending further consideration of the complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 8/26/2020. (dob)
August 19, 2020 Submission of #2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (eop)
August 19, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ronald E. McClenny, Jr. re #3 Order. (eop)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Ronald E. McClenny, Jr.. (eop)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ronald E. McClenny, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 8/19/2020 to correct filer's name (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClenny v. Conway et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald E. McClenny, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. L. (Butch) Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Hashmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?