Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Lewis et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Angel Aquino Ilagan and Zachary Seth Lewis
Case Number: 1:2020cv03417
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:09
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER Granting Petitioner's Motions for Final Default Judgment Against Respondents re: #14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Zachary Seth Lewis , #17 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Angel Aquino Ilagan . (Richard, John)
October 5, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Angel Aquino Ilagan with Brief In Support by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Petitioner's Counsel, #2 Exhibit B - Petitioner's Memorandum of Law in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Richard, John)
October 5, 2020 Clerks Entry of Default as to Angel Aquino Ilagan. (dob)
October 5, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default Petitioner's Request for Entry of Clerk's Default Against Respondent Angel Aquino Ilagan by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Petitoner's Counsel)(Richard, John)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Zachary Seth Lewis with Brief In Support by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of John Richard, #2 Exhibit B - Memorandum of Law in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Richard, John)
September 24, 2020 Clerks Entry of Default as to Zachary Seth Lewis re #13 Motion. (jta)
September 24, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default Petitioner's Request for Entry of Clerk's Default Against Respondent Zachary Seth Lewis by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Richard, John)
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE Of Filing USM 285/Return of Service (duplicate documents) re #10 Return of Service Executed, #11 Return of Service Executed. (Attachments: #1 USM285-Lewis)(jta)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Zachary Seth Lewis served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (Richard, John)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Angel Aquino Ilagan served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (Richard, John)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Richard, John)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS BY THE U.S. MARSHALL SERVICE. It is hereby ORDERED that the U.S. Marshals Service shall serve process in this matter under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3) and make return of such service with this Court, with Petitioner to submit all forms and fees required by the U.S. Marshals Service. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/25/2020. (jta)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 7/24/2020. (bgt)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER Directing Service Of Process By The U.S. Marshals Service. (Richard, John)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Angel Aquino Ilagan. (eop)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Zachary Seth Lewis. (eop)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10038599) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Aquino Ilagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Seth Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: John Joseph Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?