Mendez v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Adriana Mendez
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03422
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 Initial Disclosures by Adriana Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C)(Carpenter, Linda)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons by Adriana Mendez. (Carpenter, Linda)
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Carpenter, Linda)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Rogers, Jennie)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/24/2020. (bnp)
August 20, 2020 Judge Amy Totenberg added. Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. terminated. (Judge Correction done.) (eop) Modified on 8/24/2020 (eop).
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Disclosures by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc..(Rogers, Jennie)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Other Affiliate Sam's East, Inc., Other Affiliate Sam's Real Estate Business Trust, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Other Affiliate ASDA Group Limited, Other Affiliate Beaver Lake Aviation, Inc., Other Affiliate Bharti Walmart Private Limited, Other Affiliate Central American Retail Holding Company N.V., Other Affiliate Corporacion de Companias Agroindustriales, Other Affiliate Corporacion de Supermercados Unidos S.A., Other Affiliate Distribucion y Servicio D&S S.A., Other Affiliate La Fruga S.A., Other Affiliate Massmart Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Sam's West, Inc., Other Affiliate Texas Retail Energy, LLC, Other Affiliate The Seiyu, Ltd., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Argentina S.R.L., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Brasil, Ltda., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Canada Corp., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart China Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Walmart de Mxico, S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Leasing, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Other Affiliate WMS SUPERMERCADOS DO BRASIL, S.A. (formerly Sonae Distribuicao Brasil S.A.), Other Affiliate Walmart Claims Services, Inc. (formerly known as Claims Management, Inc.) for Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc..(Rogers, Jennie)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc., Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC for Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P..(Rogers, Jennie)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 18, 2020 Notification of Docket Correction; Case opened with wrong District Judge. Deleted District Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. and added District Judge Amy Totenberg. (eop)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Discovery ends on 1/15/2021. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-10040103) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Plaintiff's Responses to Discovery, #2 Exhibit -B -Pleadings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriana Mendez
Represented By: Kenneth William Brosnahan
Represented By: Linda Gail Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Represented By: Jennie Estes Rogers
Represented By: Howard M. Lessinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Jennie Estes Rogers
Represented By: Howard M. Lessinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?