Belakip, LLC v. Cascade Sweep Products, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Belakip, LLC
Defendant: Capital Soap Products, LLC and Cascade Sweep Products, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv03479
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 17 Initial Disclosures by Capital Soap Products, LLC, Cascade Sweep Products, LLC.(Mikkelsen, Matthew)
October 15, 2020 Filing 16 Initial Disclosures by Belakip, LLC.(Ferrand, Frederick)
October 15, 2020 Filing 15 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Capital Soap Products, LLC, Cascade Sweep Products, LLC. (Mikkelsen, Matthew)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Belakip, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Flamant for Belakip, LLC by Belakip, LLC.(Ferrand, Frederick) Modified to edit text on 9/21/2020 (ah).
September 15, 2020 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital Soap Products, LLC, Cascade Sweep Products, LLC. (Merbaum, David) Modified to edit text on 9/16/2020 (ah).
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Cascade Sweep Products, LLC.(Merbaum, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Capital Soap Products, LLC. Discovery ends on 2/12/2021.(Merbaum, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Belakip, LLC. Capital Soap Products, LLC served on 9/5/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Ferrand, Frederick)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Belakip, LLC. Capital Soap Products, LLC served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (Ferrand, Frederick)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Belakip, LLC. Cascade Sweep Products, LLC served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. (Ferrand, Frederick)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 8/24/2020. (ah)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (tcc)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Capital Soap Products, LLC. (tcc)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cascade Sweep Products, LLC. (tcc)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Belakip, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10055710) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belakip, LLC v. Cascade Sweep Products, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belakip, LLC
Represented By: Frederick Owen Ferrand
Represented By: Sabrina Lynn Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Soap Products, LLC
Represented By: David Jason Merbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cascade Sweep Products, LLC
Represented By: David Jason Merbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?