Brantley v. LVNV Funding, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Prince Brantley
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC and Resurgent Capital Services L.P.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03487
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: Regina D Cannon
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Persons by Prince Brantley. (Sandt, Jillian)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Plaintiff's counselis DIRECTED to file a CIP within five (5) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 10/13/2020. (jta)
October 13, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: LVNV Funding, LLC answer due 10/30/2020; Resurgent Capital Services L.P. answer due 10/30/2020 re #17 Order. (jta)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Defendants are ORDERED to file their Amended Answers or other responsive pleading to the #16 Amended Complaint on or before Friday, October 30, 2020. Discovery will begin thirty (30) days after the first defendant filed an Amended Answer, and the parties should file their Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan on or before that date. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 26; LR 16.2, 26.2, NDGa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 10/12/2020. (jta)
October 9, 2020 Filing 16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against LVNV Funding, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services L.P.with Jury Demand filed by Prince Brantley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Store Receipt, #2 Exhibit B - Magistrate Lawsuit, #3 Exhibit C - Magistrate Lawsuit Answer, #4 Exhibit D - Magistrate Lawsuit Dismissal)(Sandt, Jillian) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 21, 2020 Filing 14 Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 9/21/2020. (jta)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Resurgent Capital Services L.P. by Resurgent Capital Services L.P..(Chapman, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LVNV Funding, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sherman Originator, LLC for LVNV Funding, LLC by LVNV Funding, LLC.(Chapman, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Resurgent Capital Services L.P..(Chapman, Michael) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by LVNV Funding, LLC. Discovery ends on 2/16/2021.(Chapman, Michael) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Bedard, Jr on behalf of LVNV Funding, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services L.P. (Bedard, John)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael K. Chapman on behalf of LVNV Funding, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services L.P. (Chapman, Michael)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service as to defendant RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, LP mailed to Registered Agent: Corporation Service Company on 8/25/2020. (Sandt, Jillian) Modified on 8/25/2020 to edit text to reflect party deft (jta).
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service as to defendant LVNV Funding, LLC mailed to Registered Agent : Corporation Service Company on 8/25/2020. (Sandt, Jillian) Modified on 8/25/2020 to edit text to reflect party deft(jta).
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Resurgent Capital Services L.P.. (eop)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to LVNV Funding, LLC. (eop)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Prince Brantley. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10058416) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Brandsmart Receipt, #2 Exhibit -B -State Lawsuit, #3 Exhibit -C -State Lawsuit Answer, #4 Exhibit -D -State Lawsuit Dismissal, #5 Verification, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brantley v. LVNV Funding, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC
Represented By: John H. Bedard, Jr.
Represented By: Michael K. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services L.P.
Represented By: John H. Bedard, Jr.
Represented By: Michael K. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prince Brantley
Represented By: Jillian Sandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?