Martin Concrete Construction, Inc. v. Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Martin Concrete Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc. and McGriff Insurance Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03581
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by McGriff Insurance Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Truist Bank, Corporate Parent Truist Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Truist Insurance Holdings, Inc. for McGriff Insurance Services, Inc.. (Bedard, Stephanie)
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by McGriff Insurance Services, Inc..(Bedard, Stephanie) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Company, Corporate Parent OCM GOLDFISH INC., Corporate Parent OMERS ADMINISTRATION CORPORATION, Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Holdings (Ireland) Ltd., Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, Ltd., Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc., Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Company Holdings I, Ltd., Corporate Parent 1102952 B.C. Unlimited Liability Company for Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc.. (Freeman, Christopher)
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 Allied World Assurance Company's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc.. Discovery ends on 3/5/2021.(Freeman, Christopher) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Jett on behalf of McGriff Insurance Services, Inc. (Jett, John)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: For good cause shown, the #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant McGriff Insurance Services, Inc. shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than October 7, 2020. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/21/20. (bnw)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by McGriff Insurance Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bedard, Stephanie)
September 18, 2020 Notification of Docket Correction re #7 Return of Service Executed on 9/15/2020. (bdb)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Martin Concrete Construction, Inc.. Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc. served on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Ely, Shattuck) Modified on 9/18/2020 to correct served date (bdb).
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Martin Concrete Construction, Inc.. McGriff Insurance Services, Inc. served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (Ely, Shattuck)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (eop)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by Martin Concrete Construction, Inc.. (eop)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to McGriff Insurance Services, Inc.. (eop) Modified on 9/1/2020 to correct Date Issued (eop).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc.. (eop)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Martin Concrete Construction, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10080352) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin Concrete Construction, Inc. v. Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Concrete Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Derek Schwahn
Represented By: Shattuck Ely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc.
Represented By: Heidi Hudson Raschke
Represented By: Amanda Dawn Proctor
Represented By: Christopher B. Freeman
Represented By: Roben West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGriff Insurance Services, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Newton Bedard
Represented By: John P. Jett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?