Hanson v. Chapman
Plaintiff: Sharon Hanson
Defendant: Luther Chapman
Case Number: 1:2020cv03622
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Alan J Baverman
Referring Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Magistrate Court of Clayton County re #7 Remand Letter, #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (tmf)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 Remand Letter to Magistrate Court of Clayton County (tmf)
September 22, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (tmf)
September 22, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Luther Chapman, Sharon Hanson re #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (tmf)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting #4 Final Report and Recommendation. The Clerk is DIRECTED to CLOSE this case and REMAND it to the Magistrate Court of Clayton County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/22/2020. (tmf)
September 21, 2020 Submission of #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Notice of Removal, filed by Luther Chapman, to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (tmf)
September 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Luther Chapman, Sharon Hanson re #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (rjs)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER (found in the #4 RR) granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 9/2/2020. (rjs)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 9/2/2020. (rjs)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Notice of Removal RECOMMENDING that this case be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Clayton County, Georgia, on frivolity grounds for want of subject-matter jurisdiction. The Clerk is DIRECTED to TERMINATE the reference to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 9/2/2020. (rjs)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Luther Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 2, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (eop)
September 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Luther Chapman re #2 Order. (eop)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (eop)
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Luther Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanson v. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?