Johnson Controls Technology Company et al v. Price Industries Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Johnson Controls Technology Company and Air Distribution Technologies IP, LLC
Defendant: Price Industries Limited and Price Industries Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03692
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Johnson Controls Technology Company, Air Distribution Technologies IP, LLC. Price Industries Inc. waiver mailed on 9/11/2020, answer due 12/10/2020. (Deutchman, Jill)
October 15, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Johnson Controls Technology Company, Air Distribution Technologies IP, LLC. Price Industries Limited waiver mailed on 9/11/2020, answer due 12/10/2020. (Deutchman, Jill)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission of Taniel Anderson Pro Hac Vice; granting #12 Application for Admission of Janine Carlan Pro Hac Vice; granting #13 Application for Admission of Gary Coad Pro Hac Vice; granting #14 Application for Admission of Bradford Frese Pro Hac Vice. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/21/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnp)
September 15, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Janine Carlan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10131390). Attorney Janine A. Carlan added appearing on behalf of Air Distribution Technologies IP, LLC, Johnson Controls Technology Company (cdg)
September 15, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Bradford Frese Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10131392). Attorney Bradford Frese added appearing on behalf of Air Distribution Technologies IP, LLC, Johnson Controls Technology Company (cdg)
September 15, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Taniel Anderson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10131389). Attorney Taniel Anderson added appearing on behalf of Air Distribution Technologies IP, LLC, Johnson Controls Technology Company (cdg)
September 15, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Gary Coad Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10131391).. Attorney Gary Coad added appearing on behalf of Air Distribution Technologies IP, LLC, Johnson Controls Technology Company (cdg)
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Bradford Frese Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10131392).by Air Distribution Technologies IP, LLC, Johnson Controls Technology Company. (Deutchman, Jill) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Gary Coad Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10131391).by Air Distribution Technologies IP, LLC, Johnson Controls Technology Company. (Deutchman, Jill) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Janine Carlan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10131390).by Air Distribution Technologies IP, LLC, Johnson Controls Technology Company. (Deutchman, Jill) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Taniel Anderson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10131389).by Air Distribution Technologies IP, LLC, Johnson Controls Technology Company. (Deutchman, Jill) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 11, 2020 Clerks Notation re #7 Certificate of Interested Persons, #8 Certificate of Interested Persons. Read and approved by LMM. (bnp)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/10/2020. (bnp)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (tmf)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson Controls Technology Company identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International, plc for Johnson Controls Technology Company. (Deutchman, Jill)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air Distribution Technologies IP, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International, plc for Air Distribution Technologies IP, LLC. (Deutchman, Jill)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED AO 120 . (Deutchman, Jill)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT CORRECTING SIGNATURE PAGE against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Johnson Controls Technology Company.(Deutchman, Jill) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (eop)
September 9, 2020 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (eop)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Price Industries Limited. (eop)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Price Industries Inc.. (eop)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Johnson Controls Technology Company and Air Distribution Technologies IP, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10111699) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Exhibit -D, #5 Exhibit -E, #6 Exhibit -F, #7 Exhibit -G, #8 Exhibit -H, #9 Exhibit -I, #10 Exhibit -J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson Controls Technology Company et al v. Price Industries Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson Controls Technology Company
Represented By: Taniel Anderson
Represented By: Janine A. Carlan
Represented By: Jill Allison Deutchman
Represented By: Bradford Frese
Represented By: Gary Coad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Air Distribution Technologies IP, LLC
Represented By: Taniel Anderson
Represented By: Janine A. Carlan
Represented By: Jill Allison Deutchman
Represented By: Bradford Frese
Represented By: Gary Coad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Price Industries Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Price Industries Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?