Brown et al v. Azar et al
Plaintiff: Richard Lee Brown, Jeffrey Rondeau, National Apartment Association, David Krausz and Sonya Jones
Defendant: Alex Azar, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Centers For Disease Control and Prevention and Nina B. Witkofsky
Amicus Curiae: National Medical Association, Georgia Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Sabriya A. Linton, Danya A. Keene, Matthew Desmond, National Hispanic Medical Association, Nat'l Housing Law Project, Legal Services of Northern Virginia, Atlanta Legal Aid Society, Children's Healthwatch, Gregg Gonsalves, Virginia Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, David Vlahov, American Medical Association, Gabriel L. Schwartz, GLMA: Healthcare Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality, Southern Poverty Law Center, Michael Z. Levy, The George Consortium, North Carolina Pediatric Society, State Chapter of the American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, Julia Raifman, Craig E. Pollack, Emily A. Benfer, Kathryn M. Leifheit, South Carolina Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Professor Emily Benfer and Public Health Law Watch
Case Number: 1:2020cv03702
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Alex Azar, U.S. Centers For Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Nina B. Witkofsky. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vigen, Leslie)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: For good cause shown, Defendants' #49 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint no later than November 23, 2020. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 11/4/20. (bnw)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying #18 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/29/2020. (ddm)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER approving #39 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/27/20. (bnw)
October 26, 2020 Filing 47 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/20/20, before Judge JP Boulee. Court Reporter/Transcriber PENNY COUDRIET. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/16/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/27/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing) (ppc)
October 21, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #39 APPLICATION for Admission of Emily A. Benfer Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Emily A. Benfer added appearing on behalf of American Academy of Pediatrics, American Medical Association, Emily Benfer, Emily A. Benfer, Children's Healthwatch, Matthew Desmond, GLMA: Healthcare Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality, Georgia Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Gregg Gonsalves, Danya A. Keene, Kathryn M. Leifheit, Michael Z. Levy, Sabriya A. Linton, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, North Carolina Pediatric Society, State Chapter of the American Academy of Pediatrics, Craig E. Pollack, Public Health Law Watch, Julia Raifman, Gabriel L. Schwartz, South Carolina Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Southern Poverty Law Center, The George Consortium, Virginia Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, David Vlahov (nmb)
October 20, 2020 Filing 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Boulee: The Court held oral argument on the pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction.The Court took motion under advisement. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter Penny Coudriet)(ddm)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #40 #41 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/20/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
October 20, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #41 APPLICATION for Admission of Katherine Elizabeth Walz Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Katherine Walz added appearing on behalf of Nat'l Housing Law Project, Legal Services of Northern Virginia, Atlanta Legal Aid Society (nmb)
October 20, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #42 APPLICATION for Admission of Dipti Pidikiti-Smith Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Dipti Pidikiti-Smith added appearing on behalf of Nat'l Housing Law Project, Legal Services of Northern Virginia, Atlanta Legal Aid Society (nmb)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #27 #42 #44 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/20/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
October 20, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #44 APPLICATION for Admission of Jennifer Ann Fulmer Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Jennifer Ann Fulmer added appearing on behalf of Nat'l Housing Law Project, Legal Services of Northern Virginia, Atlanta Legal Aid Society (nmb)
October 19, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #40 APPLICATION for Admission of J.L. Pottenger, Jr Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney J. L. Pottenger, Jr. added appearing on behalf of American Academy of Pediatrics, American Medical Association, Emily Benfer, Emily A. Benfer, Children's Healthwatch, Matthew Desmond, GLMA: Healthcare Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality, Georgia Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Gregg Gonsalves, Danya A. Keene, Kathryn M. Leifheit, Michael Z. Levy, Sabriya A. Linton, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, North Carolina Pediatric Society, State Chapter of the American Academy of Pediatrics, Craig E. Pollack, Public Health Law Watch, Julia Raifman, Gabriel L. Schwartz, South Carolina Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Southern Poverty Law Center, The George Consortium, Virginia Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, David Vlahov (nmb)
October 16, 2020 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Richard Lee Brown, Sonya Jones, David Krausz, National Apartment Association, Jeffrey Rondeau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Robert Pinnegar)(Kruckenberg, Caleb)
October 16, 2020 Filing 44 APPLICATION for Admission of Jennifer Ann Fulmer Pro Hac Vice.by Nat'l Housing Law Project, Legal Services of Northern Virginia, Atlanta Legal Aid Society. (Siegel, Lindsey) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: For good cause shown, Plaintiffs' #38 Unopposed Motion is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' reply shall not exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/16/20. (bnw)
October 15, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE by Alex Azar, U.S. Centers For Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Nina B. Witkofsky re #22 Response in Opposition to Motion (Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CDC Order Frequently Asked Questions)(Vigen, Leslie)
October 15, 2020 Filing 42 APPLICATION for Admission of Dipti Pidikiti-Smith Pro Hac Vice.by Nat'l Housing Law Project, Legal Services of Northern Virginia, Atlanta Legal Aid Society. (Siegel, Lindsey) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 15, 2020 Filing 41 APPLICATION for Admission of Katherine Elizabeth Walz Pro Hac Vice.by Nat'l Housing Law Project, Legal Services of Northern Virginia, Atlanta Legal Aid Society. (Siegel, Lindsey) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 15, 2020 Filing 40 APPLICATION for Admission of J.L. Pottenger, Jr Pro Hac Vice.by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Medical Association, Emily Benfer, Emily A. Benfer, Children's Healthwatch, Matthew Desmond, GLMA: Healthcare Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality, Georgia Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Gregg Gonsalves, Danya A. Keene, Kathryn M. Leifheit, Michael Z. Levy, Sabriya A. Linton, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, North Carolina Pediatric Society, State Chapter of the American Academy of Pediatrics, Craig E. Pollack, Public Health Law Watch, Julia Raifman, Gabriel L. Schwartz, South Carolina Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Southern Poverty Law Center, The George Consortium, Virginia Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, David Vlahov. (Smith, Wingo) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 15, 2020 Filing 39 APPLICATION for Admission of Emily A. Benfer Pro Hac Vice.by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Medical Association, Emily Benfer, Emily A. Benfer, Children's Healthwatch, Matthew Desmond, GLMA: Healthcare Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality, Georgia Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Gregg Gonsalves, Danya A. Keene, Kathryn M. Leifheit, Michael Z. Levy, Sabriya A. Linton, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, North Carolina Pediatric Society, State Chapter of the American Academy of Pediatrics, Craig E. Pollack, Public Health Law Watch, Julia Raifman, Gabriel L. Schwartz, South Carolina Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Southern Poverty Law Center, The George Consortium, Virginia Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, David Vlahov. (Smith, Wingo) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 14, 2020 RETURN of #26 APPLICATION for Admission of Dipti Pidikiti-Smith Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10245786). to attorney for correction regarding local counsel address. (nmb)
October 14, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #27 APPLICATION for Admission of Flor Salvador Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10246089).. Attorney Flor Salvador added appearing on behalf of Nat'l Housing Law Project, Legal Services of Northern Virginia, Atlanta Legal Aid Society (nmb)
October 14, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #32 APPLICATION for Admission of Eric Dunn Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10246711).. Attorney Eric Dunn added appearing on behalf of Nat'l Housing Law Project, Legal Services of Northern Virginia, Atlanta Legal Aid Society (nmb)
October 14, 2020 RETURN of #28 APPLICATION for Admission of Jennifer Ann Fulmer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10246151). to attorney for correction regarding local counsel address. (nmb)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #32 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/14/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
October 14, 2020 RETURN of #29 APPLICATION for Admission of Emily A. Benfer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10246395). to attorney for correction regarding party. (nmb)
October 14, 2020 RETURN of #35 APPLICATION for Admission of Katherine Elizabeth Walz Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10246855). to attorney for correction regarding case number. (nmb)
October 14, 2020 RETURN of #30 APPLICATION for Admission of J.L. Pottenger, Jr Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10246438). to attorney for correction regarding party. (nmb)
October 13, 2020 Filing 38 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply in Support of Preliminary Injunction by Richard Lee Brown, Sonya Jones, David Krausz, National Apartment Association, Jeffrey Rondeau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Memorandum of Law)(Kruckenberg, Caleb)
October 13, 2020 Filing 37 RESPONSE BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Emily Benfer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Statements of Interest of Amici Curiae, #2 Exhibit B. Table of Authorities)(bnw)
October 13, 2020 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE IN OPPOSITION re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Nat'l Housing Law Project, Legal Services of Northern Virginia, Atlanta Legal Aid Society. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(bnw)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: For good cause shown, the #33 Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to docket the Brief of Amici Curiae in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Doc. 33-1] as of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/13/20. (bnw)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: For good cause shown, the #31 Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to docket the Brief of Amici Curiae [Doc. 31-1] as of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/13/20. (bnw)
October 9, 2020 Filing 35 APPLICATION for Admission of Katherine Elizabeth Walz Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10246855).by Nat'l Housing Law Project, Legal Services of Northern Virginia, Atlanta Legal Aid Society. (Siegel, Lindsey) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 9, 2020 Filing 34 Certificate of Interested Persons by Nat'l Housing Law Project, Legal Services of Northern Virginia, Atlanta Legal Aid Society. (Siegel, Lindsey)
October 9, 2020 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief with Brief In Support by Nat'l Housing Law Project, Legal Services of Northern Virginia, Atlanta Legal Aid Society. (Attachments: #1 Brief of Amici Curiae, #2 Appendix A)(Siegel, Lindsey)
October 9, 2020 Filing 32 APPLICATION for Admission of Eric Dunn Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10246711).by Nat'l Housing Law Project, Legal Services of Northern Virginia, Atlanta Legal Aid Society. (Siegel, Lindsey) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 9, 2020 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION Leave to File Amicus Brief #22 Response in Opposition to Motion, #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on behalf of Amici Curiae with Brief In Support by Emily Benfer. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief of Amici Curiae, #2 Exhibit Ex A - Statements of Interest of Amici Curiae, #3 Exhibit Ex B - Table of Authorities)(Smith, Wingo)
October 9, 2020 Filing 30 APPLICATION for Admission of J.L. Pottenger, Jr Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10246438).by Emily Benfer. (Smith, Wingo) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 9, 2020 Filing 29 APPLICATION for Admission of Emily A. Benfer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10246395).by Emily Benfer. (Smith, Wingo) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 9, 2020 Filing 28 APPLICATION for Admission of Jennifer Ann Fulmer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10246151).by Nat'l Housing Law Project, Legal Services of Northern Virginia, Atlanta Legal Aid Society. (Siegel, Lindsey) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 9, 2020 Filing 27 APPLICATION for Admission of Flor Salvador Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10246089).by Nat'l Housing Law Project, Legal Services of Northern Virginia, Atlanta Legal Aid Society. (Siegel, Lindsey) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 9, 2020 Filing 26 APPLICATION for Admission of Dipti Pidikiti-Smith Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10245786).by Nat'l Housing Law Project, Legal Services of Northern Virginia, Atlanta Legal Aid Society. (Siegel, Lindsey) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 9, 2020 Filing 25 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by John Owen Gainey on behalf of Nat'l Housing Law Project, Legal Services of Northern Virginia, Atlanta Legal Aid Society. (Gainey, John)
October 9, 2020 Filing 24 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Charles Richardson Bliss on behalf of Nat'l Housing Law Project, Legal Services of Northern Virginia, Atlanta Legal Aid Society. (Bliss, Charles)
October 8, 2020 Filing 23 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Lindsey Meredith Siegel on behalf of Nat'l Housing Law Project, Legal Services of Northern Virginia, Atlanta Legal Aid Society. (Siegel, Lindsey)
October 7, 2020 NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING : Oral Argument Hearing set for 10/20/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge J. P. Boulee. Connection Instructions: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1606365521 Passcode: 116770 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252 You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (bnw)
October 6, 2020 Submission of the #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (aaq)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: For good cause shown, the #21 Motion by Amicus Curiae for Permission to Exceed Page Limitations is GRANTED. The brief shall not exceed thirty-five pages. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/5/20. (bnw)
October 2, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alex Azar, U.S. Centers For Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Nina B. Witkofsky. (Vigen, Leslie)
October 2, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on behalf of Amicus Curiae by Emily Benfer. (Smith, Wingo)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: For good cause shown, Defendants' #20 Consent Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' response brief may exceed the page limitation, but shall not exceed forty-seven pages in length. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/2/20. (bnw)
October 1, 2020 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Alex Azar, U.S. Centers For Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Nina B. Witkofsky. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vigen, Leslie)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 18, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Richard Lee Brown, Jeffrey Rondeau, David Krausz, Sonya Jones, National Apartment Association. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Rick Brown, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Jeffrey Rondeau, #4 Exhibit Declaration of David Krausz, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Sonya Jones, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Robert Pinnegar)(Kruckenberg, Caleb) Modified on 9/22/2020 to edit filers (ddm).
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Motion and Memorandum of Law for a Preliminary Injunction in Excess of 25 Pages #15 and Joint Motion for Entry of Proposed Briefing Schedule #16 . Plaintiffs' brief in support of their Motion for Preliminary Injunction may exceed twenty-five pages. The brief, however, shall not exceed thirty-nine pages. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction no later than October 2, 2020. Plaintiffs' reply, if any, shall be filed no later than October 16, 2020. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/18/2020. (ddm)
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 Joint MOTION Entry of Proposed Scheduling Order #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #15 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Richard Lee Brown, Jeffrey Rondeau, David Krausz, Sonya Jones, National Apartment Association . (Kruckenberg, Caleb) Modified on 9/22/2020 to edit filers (ddm).
September 18, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Richard Lee Brown, Jeffrey Rondeau, David Krausz, Sonya Jones, National Apartment Association . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Memorandum of Law)(Kruckenberg, Caleb) Modified on 9/22/2020 to edit filers (ddm).
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Richard Lee Brown, Jeffrey Rondeau, David Krausz, Sonya Jones, National Apartment Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Rick Brown, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Jeffrey Rondeau, #3 Exhibit Declaration of David Krausz, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Sonya Jones, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Robert Pinnegar)(Kruckenberg, Caleb) Modified on 9/22/2020 to edit filers (ddm).
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Richard Lee Brown, Jeffrey Rondeau, David Krausz, Sonya Jones, National Apartment Association re #5 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Withdrawing Pending Motions (Kruckenberg, Caleb) Modified on 9/22/2020 to edit filers (ddm).
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Richard Lee Brown, Jeffrey Rondeau, David Krausz, Sonya Jones, National Apartment Association. (Kruckenberg, Caleb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 9/22/2020 to edit filers (ddm).
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Motion and Memorandum of Law for a Preliminary Injunction in Excess of 25 Pages and Exhibits, Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Exhibits , as to Defendants, Secretary Alex Azar, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Acting Chief of Staff Nina B. Witkofsky, U.S. Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Attorney for N.D. Georgia, Attorney General of the U.S.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Proof of Service, #5 Proof of Service)(Kruckenberg, Caleb)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Motion for TRO or PI , as to Nina B. Witkofsky, Dept. of Health and Human Services, Alex Azar, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention. (Hawkins, James)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie Cooper Vigen on behalf of Alex Azar, U.S. Centers For Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Nina B. Witkofsky (Vigen, Leslie)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/10/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
September 10, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Caleb Kruckenberg Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10117573). Attorney Caleb Kruckenberg added appearing on behalf of Richard Lee Brown (cdg)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/9/20. (bnw)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge J. P. Boulee for all further proceedings. Judge William M. Ray, II no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:20-cv-3702-JPB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 9/8/2020. (ah)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction, IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED, filed by Richard Lee Brown. (Hawkins, James) . Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 9/9/2020 (ddm).
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Richard Lee Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Brief in Excess of Page Limit)(Hawkins, James)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Caleb Kruckenberg Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10117573).by Richard Lee Brown. (Hawkins, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ah)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Dept., #2 Summons Witkofsky, #3 Summons CDC)(ah)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with TRO request filed by Richard Lee Brown (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10116860). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 8, 2020 Submission of #1 Complaint for TRO ruling, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (ah)
September 8, 2020 Submission of #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (ah)
September 8, 2020 Submission of #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Centers For Disease Control and Prevention
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina B. Witkofsky
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Lee Brown
Represented By: James W. Hawkins
Represented By: Caleb Kruckenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Rondeau
Represented By: James W. Hawkins
Represented By: Caleb Kruckenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Apartment Association
Represented By: James W. Hawkins
Represented By: Caleb Kruckenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Krausz
Represented By: James W. Hawkins
Represented By: Caleb Kruckenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Jones
Represented By: James W. Hawkins
Represented By: Caleb Kruckenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Medical Association
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: J. L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Georgia Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: J. L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sabriya A. Linton
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: J. L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Danya A. Keene
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: J. L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Matthew Desmond
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: J. L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Hispanic Medical Association
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: J. L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Nat'l Housing Law Project, Legal Services of Northern Virginia, Atlanta Legal Aid Society
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Fulmer
Represented By: Flor Salvador
Represented By: Eric Dunn
Represented By: Dipti Pidikiti-Smith
Represented By: John Owen Gainey
Represented By: Charles Richardson Bliss
Represented By: Katherine Walz
Represented By: Lindsey Meredith Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Children's Healthwatch
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: J. L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gregg Gonsalves
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: J. L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Virginia Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: J. L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: David Vlahov
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: J. L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Medical Association
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: J. L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gabriel L. Schwartz
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: J. L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GLMA: Healthcare Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: J. L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Southern Poverty Law Center
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: J. L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michael Z. Levy
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: J. L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The George Consortium
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: J. L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: North Carolina Pediatric Society, State Chapter of the American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: J. L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: J. L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Julia Raifman
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: J. L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Craig E. Pollack
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: J. L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: J. L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kathryn M. Leifheit
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: J. L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: South Carolina Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: J. L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Professor Emily Benfer
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: J. L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Public Health Law Watch
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: J. L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?