Greensky, LLC v. Breaking Ground, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Greensky, LLC
Defendant: Lamottis Woods and Breaking Ground, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv03757
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greensky, LLC identifying Corporate Parent GreenSky, Inc., Other Affiliate GreenSky Holdings, LLC for Greensky, LLC. (Barnett, Keith)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 9/15/2020. (ah)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (tmf)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Woods)(tmf)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Greensky, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10131994) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greensky, LLC v. Breaking Ground, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamottis Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breaking Ground, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greensky, LLC
Represented By: Kaylan Michelle Meaza
Represented By: Keith Jerrod Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?