Kontrolfreek, LLC v. Webster et al
Plaintiff: Kontrolfreek, LLC
Defendant: Jacques Webster, Cactus Jack Enterprises, LLC, Cactus Jack Records LLC, Travis Scott, Cactus Jack Management, LLC and Cactus Jack Publishing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv03882
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/30/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
September 29, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Lisa Hayes Meyerhoff Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10188701).. Attorney Lisa H. Meyerhoff added appearing on behalf of Kontrolfreek, LLC (cdg)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Lisa Hayes Meyerhoff Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10188701).by Kontrolfreek, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gregory, Lauren) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/25/20. (bnw)
September 25, 2020 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons APPROVED by JPB. (bnw)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (ddm)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kontrolfreek, LLC identifying Other Affiliate KontrolFreek International, Inc. for Kontrolfreek, LLC. (Gregory, Lauren)
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED AO 121 . (Gregory, Lauren)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (eop)
September 18, 2020 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (eop)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kontrolfreek, LLC.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10160735) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kontrolfreek, LLC v. Webster et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacques Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cactus Jack Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cactus Jack Records LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cactus Jack Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cactus Jack Publishing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kontrolfreek, LLC
Represented By: Lauren M. Gregory
Represented By: Lisa H. Meyerhoff
Represented By: Rebecca Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?