Labas Ventures, LLC et al v. Butterfly Agency, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Butterfly Agency, LLC and Labas Ventures, LLC
Defendant: Green Health Solutions, LLC and Yuri Turkin
Cross Defendant: Ricardas Cepas, Biota Bioscienses, LLC and Darius Cincys
Case Number: 1:2020cv03889
Filed: September 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Notification of Docket Correction re #26 RE-FILED AT #27 RESPONSE re 16 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),,, Crossclaim,,, Counterclaim,, Plaintiffs' Answer to Defendants' Counterclaim filed by Butterfly Agency, LLC, Labas Ventures, LLC. (Bryman, David) Modified on 10/30/2020 to edit document restriction and modify text (jpk). (jpk)
October 29, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to #16 Counterclaim by Butterfly Agency, LLC and Labas Ventures, LLC. (jpk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 29, 2020 Filing 26 RE-FILED AT #27 RESPONSE re #16 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),,, Crossclaim,,, Counterclaim,, Plaintiffs' Answer to Defendants' Counterclaim filed by Butterfly Agency, LLC, Labas Ventures, LLC. (Bryman, David) Modified on 10/30/2020 to edit document restriction and modify text (jpk).
October 21, 2020 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Yuri Turkin in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Butterfly Agency, LLC, Green Health Solutions, LLC, Yuri Turkin. (Debranski, Ronald) Modified on 10/22/2020 to edit text (jpk).
October 21, 2020 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eleanor L. Ross: Motion Hearing held on 10/21/2020 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Butterfly Agency, LLC, Labas Ventures, LLC. Counsel for the Defendant appeared in person and Counsel for the Plaintiff appeared via videoconference. Oral arguments were held regarding outstanding motion(s). All issues were taken under advisement and the Court will prepare an order containing its rulings. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Cohn) (jed)
October 21, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE Of Filing Zack Carnes CPA, CFP, LLC Documents by Butterfly Agency, LLC, Labas Ventures, LLC (Bryman, David) Modified on 10/22/2020 to edit text (jpk).
October 21, 2020 Filing 22 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM regarding Forum Selection Clause by Butterfly Agency, LLC, Labas Ventures, LLC. (Bryman, David) Modified on 10/22/2020 to edit text (jpk).
October 19, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE to Produce at Hearing by Butterfly Agency, LLC, Labas Ventures, LLC (Bryman, David) Modified on 10/20/2020 to edit text (jpk).
October 16, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE Of Filing Affidavit of Darius Cincys by Butterfly Agency, LLC, Labas Ventures, LLC (Bryman, David) Modified on 10/19/2020 to edit text (jpk).
October 16, 2020 NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2020 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1708 before Judge Eleanor L. Ross. Connection Instructions: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1613966153 Meeting ID: 161 396 6153 Passcode: 095682 One tap mobile +16692545252,,1613966153#,,,,,,0#,,095682# US (San Jose) +16468287666,,1613966153#,,,,,,0#,,095682# US (New York) You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (mlb)
October 15, 2020 Filing 19 Letter re: Notice of Conflicts by Butterfly Agency, LLC, Green Health Solutions, LLC, Yuri Turkin (Debranski, Ronald) Modified on 10/16/2020 to edit text (jpk).
October 14, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Butterfly Agency, LLC, Labas Ventures, LLC Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena on Zack Carnes and Zack Carnes CPA, CFP, LLC (Bryman, David)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: The Court SCHEDULES an evidentiary hearing for 9:30 a.m. on Wednesday, October 21, 2020. If the Parties wish to conduct such hearing via Zoom, they should jointly contact the undersigned's Courtroom Deputy via email to make such arrangements. Otherwise, the hearing will take place in Courtroom 1708, United States Courthouse, 75 Ted Turner Drive, S.W., Atlanta, GA, 30303. The Court will only hear argument from counsel at the hearing. Additionally, the Court ORDERS the Parties to jointly submit, via e-mail to Ms. Beck no later than 5:00 p.m. on Friday, October 16, 2020, a joint proposed schedule of the hearing setting forth how much time is requested by each party, as well as any evidentiary exhibits they intend to present at the hearing. Lastly, the Court ORDERS the Parties to submit any and all exhibits for the hearing into the docket no later than 5:00 p.m. on Friday, October 16, 2020. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/14/2020. (jpk)
October 9, 2020 Notification of Docket Correction re #16 ANSWER to 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 3/8/2021.), COUNTERCLAIM against Butterfly Agency, LLC, Labas Ventures, LLC and CROSSCLAIM against Darius Cincys, Ricardas Cepas, Biota Bio scienses, LLC with Jury Demand, by Green Health Solutions, LLC, Yuri Turkin, Butterfly Agency, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit Attachments)(Debranski, Ronald) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.u scourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 10/9/2020 (aaq).(aaq)
October 8, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 3/8/2021.), COUNTERCLAIM against Butterfly Agency, LLC, Labas Ventures, LLC and CROSSCLAIM against Darius Cincys, Ricardas Cepas, Biota Bioscienses, LLC with Jury Demand, by Green Health Solutions, LLC, Yuri Turkin, Butterfly Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit Attachments)(Debranski, Ronald) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 10/9/2020 (aaq).
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eleanor L. Ross: #2 Motion for TRO TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Court called to order. Attorneys presented arguments regarding a temporary restraining order/preliminary injunction. The issue was taken under advisement and the Court will prepare an order containing its ruling. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Cohn) (jpk)
October 5, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE Of Filing Form AO 120 by Butterfly Agency, LLC, Labas Ventures, LLC (Bryman, David) Modified on 10/6/2020 to edit text (jpk).
October 5, 2020 Filing 13 Amended NOTICE Of Filing Affidavit by Butterfly Agency, LLC, Labas Ventures, LLC (Bryman, David) Modified on 10/6/2020 to edit text (jpk).
October 2, 2020 Submission of Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120 to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpk)
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Butterfly Agency, LLC, Green Health Solutions, LLC, Yuri Turkin. (Debranski, Ronald)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Butterfly Agency, LLC, Green Health Solutions, LLC, Yuri Turkin. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Verification, #2 Brief Brief, #3 Appendix Certificate of Service, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Yuri Turkin)(Debranski, Ronald)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE Of Filing Declaration and Affidavit of Daniel Childs by Butterfly Agency, LLC, Labas Ventures, LLC (Bryman, David) Modified on 9/30/2020 (rjs).
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 25, 2020 NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING : Hearing set for 10/6/2020 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1708 before Judge Eleanor L. Ross. Connection Instructions: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1615785028 Meeting ID: 161 578 5028 Passcode: 243370 One tap mobile +16692545252,,1615785028#,,,,,,0#,,243370# US (San Jose) +16468287666,,1615785028#,,,,,,0#,,243370# US (New York) You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (mlb)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: The Court SCHEDULES a hearing on Plaintiffs' #2 Motion for Immediate Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction for Tuesday, October 6, 2020 at 9:30 a.m., in Courtroom 1708, United States Courthouse, 75 Ted Turner Drive, S.W., Atlanta, GA, 30303. The Court DIRECTS the Parties to jointly submit, via e-mail to Ms. Beck no later than 5:00 p.m. on October 1, 2020, a joint proposed schedule of the hearing setting forth how much time is requested by each party to argue each issue. Finally, the Court DIRECTS the Parties to file their briefs in accordance with the instructions stated herein. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 9/21/2020. (jpk)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Supplement to #1 Notice of Removal and Request for Hearing filed by Butterfly Agency, LLC, Labas Ventures, LLC. (Bryman, David) Modified on 9/22/2020 to edit text (jpk).
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Supplement to #1 Notice of Removal by Butterfly Agency, LLC, Green Health Solutions, LLC, Yuri Turkin (Attachments: #1 Supplement Motion for TRO, #2 Supplement Brief in Support of TRO)(Debranski, Ronald) Modified on 9/22/2020 to edit text (jpk).
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Seventh Amendment to General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (jpk)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by Butterfly Agency, LLC, Green Health Solutions, LLC, Yuri Turkin re #1 Notice of Removal (Debranski, Ronald) Modified on 9/22/2020 to edit text (jpk).
September 21, 2020 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (jpk)
September 21, 2020 Submission of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpk)
September 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Immediate Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Butterfly Agency, LLC and Labas Ventures, LLC (Originally filed in State Court on 9/16/2020). (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Immediate Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction) (jpk)
September 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Green Health Solutions, LLC, Yuri Turkin, and Butterfly Agency, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-10162521) (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Certificate of Service) (jpk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Labas Ventures, LLC et al v. Butterfly Agency, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Health Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Ronald F. Debranski, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuri Turkin
Represented By: Ronald F. Debranski, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Butterfly Agency, LLC
Represented By: David N. Bryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Labas Ventures, LLC
Represented By: David N. Bryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Ricardas Cepas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Biota Bioscienses, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Darius Cincys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?