Aegis 11 S.A. v. Funai Electric Company, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Aegis 11 S.A.
Defendant: Funai Electric Company, Ltd. and Funai Corporation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03890
Filed: September 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Funai Corporation, Inc. Answer due 1/12/2021. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/15/2020. (tcc)
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, for Defendant, filed by Aegis 11 S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kent, Daniel)
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aegis 11 S.A.. Funai Electric Company, Ltd. waiver mailed on 10/14/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (Kent, Daniel)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Aegis 11 S.A.. Funai Corporation, Inc. served on 9/25/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (Kent, Daniel)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Timothy Devlin by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on September 24, 2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb)
September 24, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Timothy Devlin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10170789). Attorney Timothy Devlin added appearing on behalf of Aegis 11 S.A. (cdg)
September 23, 2020 Clerks Notation re #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by MHC. (lwb)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 9/23/20. (jpa)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Timothy Devlin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10170789).by Aegis 11 S.A.. (Kent, Daniel) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Funai Corporation, Inc. and Funai Electric Company, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(rjs)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Aegis 11 S.A. (CORRECTED) to Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons Funai Electric)(Kent, Daniel)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Seventh Amendment to General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (rjs)
September 22, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office re #2 A.O. Form 120. (rjs)
September 19, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aegis 11 S.A. identifying Corporate Parent Sisvel International S.A. for Aegis 11 S.A. (rjs)
September 19, 2020 Filing 2 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (rjs)
September 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10162548) filed by Aegis 11 S.A. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - US 9,350,434, #2 Ex. B - 434 claim chart - 802.11ac-2013, #3 Ex. C - US 9,848,443, #4 Ex. D - 443 claim chart - 802.11-2016, #5 Ex. E - US 9,584,200, #6 Ex. F - 200 claim chart - 802.11ac-2013, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aegis 11 S.A. v. Funai Electric Company, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funai Electric Company, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funai Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aegis 11 S.A.
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Kent
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?