Burnett v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Burnett
Defendant: Wholesale Supply Depot, Amazon.com, Inc., Does 1-50, Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com Services, LLC and Brask Pet Supply
Case Number: 1:2020cv03959
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amazon.com, Inc., Does 1-50, Brask Pet Supply, and Amazon.com Services, LLC with Jury Demand filed by Richard Burnett.(Nehmens, Angela) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 11/17/2020 to edit text (jpk).
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time within which Defendants Amazon.com and Amazon.com Services, Inc. may answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended, up through and including November 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/26/2020. (jpk)
October 23, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Arnold, Brannon)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William A. Levin and GRANTING #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Angela J. Nehmens. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 9/29/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
September 29, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Angela Nehmens Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10194253).. Attorney Angela J. Nehmens added appearing on behalf of Richard Burnett (cdg)
September 29, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of William Levin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10194233).. Attorney William A. Levin added appearing on behalf of Richard Burnett (cdg)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Amazon.com Services, Inc. and Amazon.com, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Amazon.Com Services, Inc.)(rlb)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Angela Nehmens Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10194253).by Richard Burnett. (Sleppy, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of William Levin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10194233).by Richard Burnett. (Sleppy, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Richard Burnett Summons - Amazon (Sleppy, David)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Richard Burnett Summons - Amazon Services (Sleppy, David)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Seventh Amendment to General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (jpk)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Richard Burnett. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10182249) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jpk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2020: #2 Proposed Summons (Not Issued)) (jpk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burnett v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wholesale Supply Depot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Brannon Jones Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, Inc.
Represented By: Brannon Jones Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brask Pet Supply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Burnett
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Angela J. Nehmens
Represented By: David A. Sleppy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?