Karmagreen, LLC v. Mossad & J Distribution Inc.
Plaintiff: Karmagreen, LLC
Defendant: Mossad & J Distribution Inc. and M&J Distribution
Case Number: 1:2020cv03968
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Benn Wilson on behalf of Mossad & J Distribution Inc. (Wilson, Benn)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file its response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Karmagreen, LLCs Claims for Contributory Infringement, Induced Infringement, and Willful Infringement #16 on or before November 30, 2020. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/5/2020. (ah)
November 4, 2020 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss by Karmagreen, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Covington, Troy)
November 4, 2020 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mossad & J Distribution Inc.. (Howard, Gary)
November 2, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Mossad & J Distribution Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Howard, Gary)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 CONSENT Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Mossad & J Distribution Inc. Answer due 11/2/2020. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/19/2020. (bdb)
October 19, 2020 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Mossad & J Distribution Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Howard, Gary)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Petitioner Neal Seth's #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/15/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ah)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting Petitioner David Weslow's #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/15/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ah)
October 14, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Neal Seth Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10241509).. Attorney Neal Seth added appearing on behalf of Karmagreen, LLC (nmb)
October 14, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of David Weslow Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-10241485).. Attorney David E. Weslow added appearing on behalf of Karmagreen, LLC (nmb)
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Neal Seth Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10241509).by Karmagreen, LLC. (Covington, Troy) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of David Weslow Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-10241485).by Karmagreen, LLC. (Covington, Troy) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 7, 2020 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Karmagreen, LLC. Mossad & J Distribution Inc. served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Covington, Troy)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (ah)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED AO 120 . (Covington, Troy)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Karmagreen, LLC. (Covington, Troy) Modified to edit text on 9/29/2020 (ah).
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 9/25/2020. (ah)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ah)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Mossad & J Distribution Inc. (ah)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Karmagreen, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number BGANDC-10185616). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karmagreen, LLC v. Mossad & J Distribution Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mossad & J Distribution Inc.
Represented By: Benn Wilson
Represented By: Gary L. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&J Distribution
Represented By: Benn Wilson
Represented By: Gary L. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karmagreen, LLC
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Represented By: David E. Weslow
Represented By: Neal Seth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?