5 ALF Nutmeg REO, LLC v. Drew Commercial Real Estate Investment, LLC et al
Plaintiff: 5 ALF Nutmeg REO, LLC
Defendant: Drew Commercial Real Estate Investment, LLC and Frederick Bracy
Case Number: 1:2020cv04040
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Regina D Cannon
Referring Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Frederick Bracy, Drew Commercial Real Estate Investment, LLC re #7 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, #8 Letter. (tcc)
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 Certified copy of #7 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION mailed to the Clerk of Court, Magistrate Court of Clayton County. (tcc)
October 26, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (tcc)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING the #4 Final Report and Recommendation as the order and opinion of this court, and REMANDING this action to the Magistrate Court of Clayton County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 10/26/2020. (tcc)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Frederick Bracy re #2 Order (jpa)
October 5, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Frederick Bracy, Drew Commercial Real Estate Investment, LLC re #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (tcc)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 10/5/2020. (tcc)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order (Contained w/in #4 Final R&R) ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis for purposes of jurisdictional review only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 10/5/2020. (tcc)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that the District Court REMAND this action to the Magistrate Court of Clayton County, Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 10/5/2020. (tcc)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Frederick Bracy, Drew Commercial Real Estate Investment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 1, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Frederick Bracy and Drew Commercial Real Estate Investment, LLC re #2 Order. (eop)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Frederick Bracy and Drew Commercial Real Estate Investment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 5 ALF Nutmeg REO, LLC v. Drew Commercial Real Estate Investment, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drew Commercial Real Estate Investment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Bracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 5 ALF Nutmeg REO, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?