Warth v. U. S. District Court Clerk's Office Cash Register et al
Petitioner: David Warth
Respondent: U. S. District Court Clerk's Office Cash Register and Atlanta Federal Reserve Bank, Trustees
Case Number: 1:2020cv04059
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Filing 8 Voluntary Dismissal by David Warth. (rjs)
October 27, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (tmf)
October 27, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to David Warth re #7 Clerk's Judgment, #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation,. (tmf)
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing action (tmf)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the Magistrate Judge's R&R as well as Plaintiff's objections and agrees with the Magistrate Judge that this action is entirely frivolous. Accordingly, the Court ADOPTS the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation as the opinion of the Court. Plaintiff's Objections #3 are DENIED, and this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/27/2020. (tmf)
October 26, 2020 Submission of #3 Final Report and Recommendation,, Order ruling on IFP,, to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (tmf)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 OBJECTIONS to #3 Report and Recommendation filed by David Warth. (bdb)
October 6, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to David Warth re #3 Final Report and Recommendation and #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (rjs)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 10/6/2020. (rjs)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus: IT IS RECOMMENDED that the petition be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 4. Status for Warth to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED for the purpose of dismissal only. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 10/6/2020. (rjs)
October 1, 2020 Submission of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (eop)
October 1, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to David Warth re #2 Order. (eop)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by David Warth. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warth v. U. S. District Court Clerk's Office Cash Register et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U. S. District Court Clerk's Office Cash Register
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Atlanta Federal Reserve Bank, Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Warth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?