Adan v. Unnamed Defendant(s)
Plaintiff: Saleeban Adan
Defendant: Unnamed Defendant(s)
Case Number: 1:2020cv04149
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Regina D Cannon
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Filing Case Related Documents by Saleeban Adan. (jed)
October 23, 2020 New Civil Action Number in USDC MDGA 5:20-cv-0411 (aar)
October 23, 2020 Case electronically transferred to District of Middle District of Georgia, Macon Division. (ah)
October 23, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon terminated from case. (ah)
October 23, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Saleeban Adan re #3 Order,. (ah)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that this civil action be TRANSFERRED to the UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF GEORGIA, the Macon Division, along with all orders, motions, affidavits, pleadings and exhibits (if any) filed herein for further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 10/22/2020. (ah)
October 8, 2020 Submission of #1 Complaint for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (eop)
October 8, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Saleeban Adan re #2 Order. (eop)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Saleeban Adan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adan v. Unnamed Defendant(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unnamed Defendant(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saleeban Adan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?