Douglas County, Georgia v. Mallinckrodt PLC et al
Plaintiff: Douglas County, Georgia
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., McKesson Corporation, SpecGx LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Noramco, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Cardinal Health, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation and Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals
Case Number: 1:2020cv04166
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 New Civil Action Number in USDC NDOH 1:20-op-45271 (aar)
October 27, 2020 Case transferred to District of Northern Ohio. (jed)
October 27, 2020 Filing 19 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-178 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Case to be transferred to Northern Ohio for inclusion in MDL 2804. (jed)
October 21, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (jed)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation. The Court STAYS this case in its entirety through the later of its transfer to In re: National Opiate Litigation, No. 1:17-MD-2804 (J.P.M.L.) by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation or the declination of transfer by the Panel. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to administratively close this case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/21/2020. (jed)
October 21, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Marquardt, Elizabeth)
October 21, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Newsom, Edward)
October 21, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Rumfelt, Eileen Elizabeth)
October 20, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Sparks, Adam)
October 20, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Charles, Amber)
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Baby, Sada)
October 20, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Knapp, Halsey)
October 20, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by McKesson Corporation. (Knapp, Halsey)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on October 13, 2020. (ash)
October 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC of Suggestion of Pendency of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay of Proceedings (Cobb, James)
October 12, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC identifying Other Affiliate Mallinckrodt PLC for Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC. (Cobb, James)
October 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Blackburn Stone on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC (Stone, Julia)
October 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James William Cobb on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC (Cobb, James)
October 12, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance Holdings LLC for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Rumfelt, Eileen Elizabeth)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by McKesson Corporation. (eop)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by McKesson Corporation. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-10241392) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit -2 - Notice of Filing, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text on 10/9/2020 (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douglas County, Georgia v. Mallinckrodt PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Sada J. Baby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGx LLC
Represented By: James William Cobb
Represented By: Julia Blackburn Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: James William Cobb
Represented By: Julia Blackburn Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Represented By: Cari K. Dawson
Represented By: Jenny Ann Hergenrother
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher A. Wiech
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: Jacqueline Tandy Menk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC
Represented By: Christopher A. Wiech
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: Jacqueline Tandy Menk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Edward McDowell Newsom
Represented By: Eileen Elizabeth Hintz Rumfelt
Represented By: Elizabeth Marquardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas County, Georgia
Represented By: Hirlye R. Lutz, III
Represented By: Kenneth Ray Bernard, Jr.
Represented By: F. Jerome Tapley
Represented By: Brett Cooper Thompson
Represented By: Adam Wade Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?