Ulrich v. Dilbeck et al
Plaintiff: Tina Ulrich
Defendant: ABC Corp., John Doe 1-10, Marcus C. Dilbeck, XYZ Corp., Southern Transport, LLC and National Indemnity Company of the South
Case Number: 1:2020cv04209
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
November 17, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Marcus C. Dilbeck, National Indemnity Company of the South, Southern Transport, LLC.(Bedford, Nicholas)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER - Upon review of the information contained in the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan [Doc. #6 ], the Court orders that the time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court, except as herein modified. 1. This case is assigned an eight-month discovery period. Discovery is open and shall close on July 12, 2021. 2. Dispositive motions shall be filed no later than August 11, 2021. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 11/17/2020. (tcc)
November 16, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Rule 5.4 by Marcus C. Dilbeck, National Indemnity Company of the South, Southern Transport, LLC.(Smith, Grant)
November 16, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marcus C. Dilbeck, National Indemnity Company of the South, Southern Transport, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc for National Indemnity Company of the South. (Smith, Grant)
November 16, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Disclosures by Marcus C. Dilbeck, National Indemnity Company of the South, Southern Transport, LLC.(Smith, Grant)
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Marcus C. Dilbeck, National Indemnity Company of the South, Southern Transport, LLC. (Smith, Grant)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/16/20. (bnw)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by Marcus C. Dilbeck, National Indemnity Company of the South, Southern Transport, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Smith, Grant)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/20. (aaq)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Marcus C. Dilbeck, National Indemnity Company of the South, and Southern Transport, LLC. Discovery ends on 3/12/2021. (Originally filed on 10/12/20 in Cobb Superior Court.) (aaq) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Southern Transport, LLC, Marcus C. Dilbeck, and National Indemnity Company of the South. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-10253573) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(aaq) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ulrich v. Dilbeck et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus C. Dilbeck
Represented By: Dorothy Paul
Represented By: Grant Butler Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Transport, LLC
Represented By: Dorothy Paul
Represented By: Grant Butler Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Indemnity Company of the South
Represented By: Dorothy Paul
Represented By: Grant Butler Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Ulrich
Represented By: Alexander Gray Hait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?