Bio World Merchandising Inc v. Interactive Business Information Systems Inc
Plaintiff: Bio World Merchandising Inc
Defendant: Interactive Business Information Systems Inc doing business as I.B.I.S.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04222
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-02072. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Memorandum Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part #4 Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue or in the Alternative Transfer under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). This case is transferred to the United Sates District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/9/2020) (mjr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/13/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The undersigned orders that all civil and criminal bench and jury trials, in-person court hearings, and sentencing proceedings scheduled to take place through May 1, 2020, are continued due to concerns about COVID-19 and consistent with the Northern District of Texas's Special Order Nos. 13-5 and 13-6, entered by Chief Judge Barbara Lynn on March 13, and March 18, 2020, respectively. In addition, if the attorneys have been ordered to conduct a face-to-face meeting for purposes of preparing a Rule 26(f) Joint Report, an in-person meeting is no longer required. These continuances do not modify any pending deadlines other than the trial or hearing dates mentioned above. Attorneys should file a motion with the Court to modify any other deadlines unless, as is the case in some cases transferred to this Court from other judges, the scheduling order allows the parties to reset deadlines by agreement without Court approval. Due to the Court's reduced ability to obtain an adequate spectrum of jurors, and due to the reduced availability of attorneys and court staff to be present in courtrooms because of the public health considerations associated with COVID-19, the period of the continuances associated with this Order and Special Order Nos. 13-5 and 13-6 are excluded by the Speedy Trial Act, 18 U.S.C. 3161(h) and 18 U.S.C. 3161 (h)(7)(A). The Court finds that the ends of justice served by ordering these continuances outweigh the best interests of the public and each defendants right to a speedy trial. In fact, the best interests of the public are served by these continuances. The Court encourages the parties to communicate with opposing counsel and litigants by video or telephone whenever possible. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 3/19/2020) (lrl) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/13/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Special Orders 13-5 and 13-6 re: Court Operations Under the Exigent Circumstances Created by the COVID-19 Pandemic (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 3/16/2020 and 3/18/2020)(lrl) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/13/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY filed by Interactive Business Information Systems Inc re: #14 Response/Objection (Garelick, Scott) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/13/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #17 Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to Reply to Plaintiff's Response in opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Reply due by 11/8/2019. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/31/2019) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/13/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #14 Response/Objection filed by Interactive Business Information Systems Inc (Garelick, Scott) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/13/2020.]
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER STAYING CASE pending a ruling on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/24/2019) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/13/2020.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 Appendix in Support filed by Bio World Merchandising Inc re #14 Response/Objection (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Knapek, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/13/2020.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE filed by Bio World Merchandising Inc re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue (Knapek, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/13/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Per Special Order 3-335 issued on September 18, 2019, your case has been transferred to Judge Ada Brown. All parties are instructed that any existing scheduling orders and deadlines imposed by the previous judge remain in place unless the parties are otherwise notified by this Court. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/8/2019) (cea) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/13/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Vacating Scheduling Conference. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/3/2019) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/13/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Special Order 3-335: Effective September 18, 2019, the cases listed on Exhibit A to this order are transferred to Judge Ada E. Brown's docket and shall henceforth be designated by the suffix letter "E." (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/18/2019) (cea) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/13/2020.]
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 10/18/2019. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/16/2019) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/13/2020.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time File Response filed by Bio World Merchandising Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Knapek, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/13/2020.]
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bio World Merchandising Inc. (Knapek, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/13/2020.]
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 Amended Notice of Removal by Interactive Business Information Systems Inc. Amendment to #6 Order. (Garelick, Scott) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/13/2020.]
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: No later than 21 days from the date of this Order, Defendant must file an amended notice of removal that alleges diversity of citizenship, in conformity with 28 U.S.C. 1332; otherwise, this action will be remanded to state court. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/11/2019) (mla) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/13/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court sets FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference for 10/11/2019, at 10:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1632, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/10/2019) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/13/2020.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Interactive Business Information Systems Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Garelick, Scott) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/13/2020.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Interactive Business Information Systems Inc. (Garelick, Scott) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/13/2020.]
August 30, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Interactive Business Information Systems Inc. (See document #1 - Exhibit D for image) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/13/2020.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/13/2020.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 68th Judicial District Court, Dallas County, case number DC-19-10319 filed by Interactive Business Information Systems, Inc. d/b/a I.B.I.S.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10230304) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Garelick, Scott) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/13/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bio World Merchandising Inc v. Interactive Business Information Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interactive Business Information Systems Inc doing business as I.B.I.S.
Represented By: Blake William Buether
Represented By: Scott M. Garelick
Represented By: P Theodore Stoinoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bio World Merchandising Inc
Represented By: Michael Lee Knapek
Represented By: Priya K Jesani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?