Anderson v. U. S. Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Anderson
Defendant: U. S. Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Prisons and USP Atlanta, GA
Case Number: 1:2020cv04358
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Alan J Baverman
Referring Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kenneth Anderson re #5 Notice (Other). (jed)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
December 4, 2020 Submission of #4 Order ruling on IFP to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (jed)
November 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kenneth Anderson and Warden of USP Atlanta re #4 Order ruling on IFP. (jed)
October 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's request for leave to In Forma Pauperis. He is ORDERED to ensure the payment of an initial partial filing fee of $11.40 within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this Order. The Clerk of Court shall transmit a copy of this Order to the Warden of the United States Penitentiary in Atlanta, Georgia. The Warden, or his designee, shall collect the aforesaid monthly payments, including the initial $11.40 payment, from Plaintiff's inmate account and remit such payments to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 10/31/2020. (jed) Modified on 11/2/2020 to edit file date (jed).
October 27, 2020 Submission of #2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (eop)
October 27, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kenneth Anderson re #3 Order. (eop)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Kenneth Anderson. (eop)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kenneth Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. U. S. Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USP Atlanta, GA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?