Thomas v. Bank of America, NA et al
Plaintiff: Keith Thomas
Defendant: Bank of America, NA, Mortgage Electronics Registration Systems, Inc., Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LLP, McGuire Woods LLP, Merscorp Holdings, Inc. collectively known as, BAC Home Loan Servicing, LLP, Bank of America Corp and Northstar Mortgage Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv04370
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:l332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (ah)
December 10, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Keith Thomas re #15 Clerk's Judgment, #14 Order. (ah)
December 10, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (ah)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Strike the Motion to Dismiss #9 is DENIED, Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment #11 is DENIED, Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time #12 is DENIED, Defendants Motion to Dismiss #8 is GRANTED, and Plaintiffs Complaint and Request for Injunctive Relief is DISMISSED. It is further ORDERED that the Plaintiffs Motion for the Court to Take Judicial Notice #10 is DENIED as moot. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this file. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 12/10/2020. (ah)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
December 8, 2020 Submission of #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (ah)
December 7, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Keith Thomas. (adg)
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Bank of America, N.A., McGuire Woods, LLP and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. by Keith Thomas. (ah)
November 30, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for the Court to Take Judicial Notice by Keith Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(ah)
November 30, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Keith Thomas. (ah)
November 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction with Brief In Support by Bank of America, NA, McGuire Woods LLP, Mortgage Electronics Registration Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mendel, Jarrod)
November 6, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Keith Thomas. Mortgage Electronics Registration Systems, Inc. served on 11/2/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (jed)
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Keith Thomas. Northstar Mortgage Group, LLC served on 11/2/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (jed)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Keith Thomas. Bank of America, NA served on 10/27/2020, answer due 11/17/2020; McGuire Woods LLP served on 10/27/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (ah)
October 29, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Keith Thomas re #4 Order. (ah)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/29/2020. (ah)
October 27, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Keith Thomas re #3 Order. (ah)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ah)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bank of America, NA, McGuire Woods LLP, Mortgage Electronics Registration Systems, Inc., Northstar Mortgage Group, LLC. (ah)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and REQUEST for Preliminary, Temporary and Permanent Injunctive Relief filed by Keith Thomas (Filing fee $400, receipt number GAN100125031). (Attachments: #1 receipt, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Bank of America, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, NA
Represented By: Jarrod Sean Mendel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronics Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Jarrod Sean Mendel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LLP
Represented By: Jarrod Sean Mendel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGuire Woods LLP
Represented By: Jarrod Sean Mendel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merscorp Holdings, Inc. collectively known as
Represented By: Jarrod Sean Mendel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loan Servicing, LLP
Represented By: Jarrod Sean Mendel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corp
Represented By: Jarrod Sean Mendel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northstar Mortgage Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?